EP1862083 - CIGARETTE PRODUCTION MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.12.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Japan Tobacco, Inc. 2-1, Toranomon 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8422 / JP | [2007/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WADA, Syuji c/o JAPAN TOBACCO INC. 17-7, Yokokawa 1-chome, Sumida-ku Tokyo 130-8603 / JP | 02 /
OBA, Takahiro c/o JAPAN TOBACCO INC. 17-7, Yokokawa 1-chome, Sumida-ku Tokyo 130-8603 / JP | 03 /
IZUMIYA, Takafumi c/o JAPAN TOBACCO INC. 17-7, Yokokawa 1-chome, Sumida-ku Tokyo 130-8603 / JP | 04 /
NAGAI, Junichi c/o JAPAN TOBACCO INC. 17-7, Yokokawa 1-chome, Sumida-ku Tokyo 130-8603 / JP | 05 /
KANEDA, Narimasa c/o JAPAN TOBACCO INC. 17-7, Yokokawa 1-chome, Sumida-ku Tokyo 130-8603 / JP | 06 /
YAMADA, Manabu c/o JAPAN TOBACCO INC. 2-1, Toranomon 2--chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8422 / JP | [2012/49] |
Former [2007/49] | 01 /
WADA, Syuji, JAPAN TOBACCO INC. 17-7, Yokokawa 1-chome, Sumida-ku Tokyo 130-8603 / JP | ||
02 /
OBA, Takahiro, JAPAN TOBACCO INC. 17-7, Yokokawa 1-chome, Sumida-ku Tokyo 130-8603 / JP | |||
03 /
IZUMIYA, Takafumi, JAPAN TOBACCO INC. 17-7, Yokokawa 1-chome, Sumida-ku Tokyo 130-8603 / JP | |||
04 /
NAGAI, Junichi, JAPAN TOBACCO INC. 17-7, Yokokawa 1-chome, Sumida-ku Tokyo 130-8603 / JP | |||
05 /
KANEDA, Narimasa, JAPAN TOBACCO INC. 17-7, Yokokawa 1-chome, Sumida-ku Tokyo 130-8603 / JP | |||
06 /
YAMADA, Manabu, JAPAN TOBACCO INC. 2-1, Toranomon 2--chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8422 / JP | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/18] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/37] | Peckmann, Ralf Reinhard, Skuhra, Weise & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/49] | Peckmann, Ralf Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05790386.6 | 06.10.2005 | [2007/49] | WO2005JP18566 | Priority number, date | JP20050057726 | 02.03.2005 Original published format: JP 2005057726 | [2007/49] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006092880 | Date: | 08.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1862083 | Date: | 05.12.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.09.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1862083 | Date: | 13.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.09.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A24C5/18, A24C5/24, A24D1/02, D21H27/00 | [2007/49] | CPC: |
A24C5/34 (EP,US);
A24C5/005 (EP,US);
F04B2201/1201 (EP,US);
F04B2205/09 (EP,US);
Y10S131/909 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/49] | Extension states | AL | 22.08.2007 | BA | 22.08.2007 | HR | 22.08.2007 | MK | 22.08.2007 | YU | 22.08.2007 | Title | German: | MASCHINE ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ZIGARETTEN | [2007/49] | English: | CIGARETTE PRODUCTION MACHINE | [2007/49] | French: | MACHINE DE PRODUCTION DE CIGARETTES | [2007/49] | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.2007 | Translation filed | 22.08.2007 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.2007 | Search fee paid | 22.08.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 22.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/49] | 09.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.11.2012 | Opposition(s) | 14.11.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.10.2005 | AT | 13.02.2013 | BE | 13.02.2013 | CY | 13.02.2013 | CZ | 13.02.2013 | DK | 13.02.2013 | EE | 13.02.2013 | FI | 13.02.2013 | LT | 13.02.2013 | LV | 13.02.2013 | MC | 13.02.2013 | PL | 13.02.2013 | RO | 13.02.2013 | SE | 13.02.2013 | SI | 13.02.2013 | SK | 13.02.2013 | BG | 13.05.2013 | GR | 14.05.2013 | ES | 24.05.2013 | IS | 13.06.2013 | PT | 13.06.2013 | IE | 06.10.2013 | LU | 06.10.2013 | FR | 31.10.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2014/48] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
BE | 13.02.2013 | ||
CY | 13.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2013 | ||
DK | 13.02.2013 | ||
EE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
MC | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
RO | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
SK | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
IE | 06.10.2013 | ||
FR | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
BE | 13.02.2013 | ||
CY | 13.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2013 | ||
DK | 13.02.2013 | ||
EE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
MC | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
RO | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
SK | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
FR | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
BE | 13.02.2013 | ||
CY | 13.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2013 | ||
DK | 13.02.2013 | ||
EE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
MC | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
RO | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
SK | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
BE | 13.02.2013 | ||
CY | 13.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2013 | ||
DK | 13.02.2013 | ||
EE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
RO | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
SK | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
BE | 13.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2013 | ||
DK | 13.02.2013 | ||
EE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
RO | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
SK | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
BE | 13.02.2013 | ||
DK | 13.02.2013 | ||
EE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
BE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
BE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 13.02.2013 | |
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 13.02.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1321048 (JAPAN TOBACCO INC [JP]) [A] 1-3 * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0076]; figure - *; | [A]US2004237979 (SEYMOUR SYDNEY KEITH [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]US2005022829 (ATWELL CHARLES G [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * the whole document * | International search | [A]WO03013284 (JAPAN TOBACCO INC [JP], et al); | [A]WO2004064546 (JAPAN TOBACCO INC [JP], et al); | [A]US2004118416 (SEYMOUR SYDNEY KEITH [US], et al); | [A]JP2004105799 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) |