EP1808921 - FUEL CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.04.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.05.2010 [2010/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/29] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEGISHI, Nobuyasu c/o Intellect. Property Div. Toshiba Corporation 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | 02 /
TAKAHASHI, Kenichi c/o Intellect. Property Div. Toshiba Corporation 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | 03 /
KAN, Hirofumi c/o Intellect. Property Div. Toshiba Corporation 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [2007/29] | Representative(s) | Maury, Richard Philip Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/29] | Maury, Richard Philip Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 05790519.2 | 04.10.2005 | [2007/29] | WO2005JP18337 | Priority number, date | JP20040296223 | 08.10.2004 Original published format: JP 2004296223 | [2007/29] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006040961 | Date: | 20.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1808921 | Date: | 18.07.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/02, H01M8/04, H01M8/10 | [2007/29] | CPC: |
H01M8/0668 (EP,US);
H01M8/04 (KR);
H01M8/04186 (EP,US);
H01M8/06 (KR);
H01M8/10 (KR);
H01M8/1007 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/49] |
Former [2007/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BRENNSTOFFZELLE | [2007/29] | English: | FUEL CELL | [2007/29] | French: | PILE A COMBUSTIBLE | [2007/29] | Entry into regional phase | 05.04.2007 | Translation filed | 04.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 04.04.2007 | Search fee paid | 04.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/29] | 09.05.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 22.06.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 26.03.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2004172111 (HITACHI MAXELL); | [A]JP2001093551 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]JP2004079506 (HITACHI MAXELL); | [A]JP2004152741 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [AP]JP2004311437 (HEWLETT PACKARD DEVELOPMENT CO); | [A]JP2003132933 (NISSAN MOTOR) |