EP1775836 - TOUCH KEY AND INDUCTION HEATING COOKING DEVICE EMPLOYING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.2013 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.08.2013 [2013/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2007/16] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006 Oaza Kadoma, Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ITO, S.@c/o Matsushita Electric Ind. Co., Ltd. IPROC 19F IMP Bldg. 1-3-7, Shiromi Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6319 / JP | [2012/36] |
Former [2007/16] | 01 /
ITO, S. c/o Matsushita Electric Ind. Co., Ltd. IPROC 19F IMP Bldg. 1-3-7, Shiromi Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6319 / JP | Representative(s) | Pautex Schneider, Nicole Véronique, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2012/36] | Pautex Schneider, Nicole Véronique, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | ||
Former [N/P] | Pautex Schneider, Nicole Véronique, et al Novagraaf International SA 25, Avenue du Pailly 1220 Les Avanchets - Geneva / CH | ||
Former [2007/16] | Pautex Schneider, Nicole Véronique, et al Novagraaf International SA 25, avenue du Pailly CH-1220 Les Avanchets-Genève / CH | Application number, filing date | 05790589.5 | 06.10.2005 | [2007/16] | WO2005JP18524 | Priority number, date | JP20040304094 | 19.10.2004 Original published format: JP 2004304094 | [2007/16] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006043424 | Date: | 27.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1775836 | Date: | 18.04.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1775836 | Date: | 05.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.04.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H05B6/06, H03K17/96 | [2011/40] | CPC: |
H05B6/062 (EP,US);
H03K17/962 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/16] | H03K17/96, H01H36/00, H05B6/12 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR [2008/04] |
Former [2007/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | TASTSCHALTER UND INDUKTIONSHEIZUNGSKOCHVORRICHTUNG DAMIT | [2007/16] | English: | TOUCH KEY AND INDUCTION HEATING COOKING DEVICE EMPLOYING THE SAME | [2007/16] | French: | TOUCHE TACTILE ET DISPOSITIF DE CUISSON PAR INDUCTION L'UTILISANT | [2007/16] | Entry into regional phase | 19.01.2007 | Translation filed | 19.01.2007 | National basic fee paid | 19.01.2007 | Search fee paid | 19.01.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.01.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/16] | 22.05.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.11.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 20.04.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 17.07.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP09163203.4 / EP2096758 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.03.2011 | Opposition(s) | 06.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH0497614 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [Y] 7 * abstract * * figure 1 *; | [X]JPH06140902 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC HOME APPL, et al) [X] 1-3,5,10 * abstract * * figures 1-14 * * machine translation paragraphs [0015],[0019] and [0021] *; | [A]EP0668657 (EUROP EQUIP MENAGER [FR]) [A] 2-5,8-10 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * * column 2, line 9 - column 3, line 44 ** column 3, line 50 - line 55 *; | [XY]JP2002039708 (AISIN SEIKI) [X] 6,8-10 * figures 1-5 * * online translation; paragraphs [0001] , [0010] , [0011] , [0017] - [0029] * [Y] 7 | International search | [Y]JP2003029899 (SONY CORP); | [Y]JPH03145329 (NEC CORP); | [X]JP2002039708 (AISIN SEIKI) | Examination | JP2003224459 |