EP1804022 - VIBRATING GYROSCOPE AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING VIBRATING GYROSCOPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.11.2015 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.12.2015 [2015/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/27] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishi-shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWAUCHI, Osamu, c/o SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 3-5, Owa 3-Chome Suwa-Shi, Nagano 3928502 / JP | 02 /
MIYAZAWA, Shigeki, c/o SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 3-5, Owa 3-Chome Suwa-Shi, Nagano 3928502 / JP | 03 /
TAKAYAMA, Katsumi, c/o SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 3-5, Owa 3-Chome Suwa-Shi, Nagano 3928502 / JP | 04 /
YAMAGUCHI, Keiichi, c/o SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 3-5, Owa 3-Chome Suwa-Shi, Nagano 3928502 / JP | [2007/27] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/27] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05790695.0 | 29.09.2005 | [2007/27] | WO2005JP18505 | Priority number, date | JP20040288716 | 30.09.2004 Original published format: JP 2004288716 | [2007/27] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006036022 | Date: | 06.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1804022 | Date: | 04.07.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.04.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01C19/56, G01P9/04 | [2007/27] | CPC: |
G01C19/5628 (EP,US);
G01C19/56 (KR);
Y10T29/42 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/02] |
Former [2007/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VIBRATIONSKREISEL UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES VIBRATIONSKREISELS | [2007/27] | English: | VIBRATING GYROSCOPE AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING VIBRATING GYROSCOPE | [2007/27] | French: | GYROSCOPE VIBRANT ET PROCEDE POUR PRODUIRE UN GYROSCOPE VIBRANT | [2007/27] | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.2007 | Translation filed | 26.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.2007 | Search fee paid | 26.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/27] | 17.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 03.12.2015 | 11.08.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/50] | 03.12.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.05.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2015 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2003133885 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [Y] 1-9* paragraphs [0002] - [0005] - [0057] , [0058]; figures 12,14-16 *; | [Y]WO2004079296 (NEC CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 1-9 * paragraphs [0021] - [0029]; figure 1 * | International search | [A]JPH10197256 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [Y]JPH1172334 (NGK INSULATORS LTD); | [Y]JP2003133885 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | [A]JP2003166828 (NGK INSULATORS LTD, et al) | Examination | US2006230828 | by applicant | JPH1172334 | JP2003133885 | WO2004079296 |