EP1803224 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ANALOGUE TO DIGITAL CONVERSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.2012 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2009/50] |
Former [2008/45] | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2008/42] | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2007/27] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAYERS, Anthony, D. c/o Philips IP & Standards Cross Oak Lane Redhill Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | [2007/27] | Representative(s) | Williamson, Paul Lewis, et al NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property and Licensing Red Central 60 High Street, Redhill Surrey RH1 1NY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/09] | Williamson, Paul Lewis, et al NXP Semiconductors UK Ltd. Intellectual Property Department Betchworth House Station Road Redhill Surrey RH1 1DL / GB | ||
Former [2008/33] | White, Andrew Gordon NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property Department Cross Oak Lane Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | ||
Former [2007/27] | White, Andrew Gordon NXP Semiconductors IP Department Cross Oak Lane Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 05790705.7 | 14.10.2005 | [2007/27] | WO2005IB53375 | Priority number, date | GB20040023011 | 16.10.2004 Original published format: GB 0423011 | [2007/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006040742 | Date: | 20.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/16] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1803224 | Date: | 04.07.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1803224 | Date: | 07.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H03M1/18 | [2007/27] | CPC: |
H03M1/188 (EP,US);
H03M1/18 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/27] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ANALOG-DIGITAL UMSETZUNG | [2007/44] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ANALOGUE TO DIGITAL CONVERSION | [2007/27] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE NUMERISATION | [2007/27] |
Former [2007/27] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ANALOG-ZU-DIGITAL-UMSETZUNG | Entry into regional phase | 16.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 16.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/27] | 06.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.08.2007 | Opposition(s) | 11.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.09.2011 | BE | 07.09.2011 | CY | 07.09.2011 | CZ | 07.09.2011 | DK | 07.09.2011 | EE | 07.09.2011 | FI | 07.09.2011 | HU | 07.09.2011 | IT | 07.09.2011 | LT | 07.09.2011 | LV | 07.09.2011 | NL | 07.09.2011 | PL | 07.09.2011 | RO | 07.09.2011 | SE | 07.09.2011 | SI | 07.09.2011 | SK | 07.09.2011 | TR | 07.09.2011 | IE | 14.10.2011 | LU | 14.10.2011 | CH | 31.10.2011 | LI | 31.10.2011 | MC | 31.10.2011 | BG | 07.12.2011 | GR | 08.12.2011 | ES | 18.12.2011 | IS | 07.01.2012 | PT | 09.01.2012 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
BE | 07.09.2011 | ||
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
DK | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
IT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
NL | 07.09.2011 | ||
PL | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
SK | 07.09.2011 | ||
TR | 07.09.2011 | ||
IE | 14.10.2011 | ||
LU | 14.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
BG | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
ES | 18.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
PT | 09.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
BE | 07.09.2011 | ||
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
DK | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
IT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
NL | 07.09.2011 | ||
PL | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
SK | 07.09.2011 | ||
IE | 14.10.2011 | ||
LU | 14.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
BG | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
ES | 18.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
PT | 09.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
BE | 07.09.2011 | ||
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
DK | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
IT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
NL | 07.09.2011 | ||
PL | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
SK | 07.09.2011 | ||
IE | 14.10.2011 | ||
LU | 14.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
ES | 18.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
PT | 09.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
BE | 07.09.2011 | ||
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
DK | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
IT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
NL | 07.09.2011 | ||
PL | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
SK | 07.09.2011 | ||
IE | 14.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
ES | 18.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
PT | 09.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
BE | 07.09.2011 | ||
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
DK | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
IT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
NL | 07.09.2011 | ||
PL | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
SK | 07.09.2011 | ||
IE | 14.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
PT | 09.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
BE | 07.09.2011 | ||
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
DK | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
IT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
NL | 07.09.2011 | ||
PL | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
SK | 07.09.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
PT | 09.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
BE | 07.09.2011 | ||
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
IT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
NL | 07.09.2011 | ||
PL | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
SK | 07.09.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
PT | 09.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
BE | 07.09.2011 | ||
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
IT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
NL | 07.09.2011 | ||
PL | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
SK | 07.09.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
PT | 09.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
BE | 07.09.2011 | ||
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
IT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
NL | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
SK | 07.09.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
PT | 09.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
BE | 07.09.2011 | ||
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
IT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
NL | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
SK | 07.09.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
PT | 09.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
BE | 07.09.2011 | ||
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/18] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
BE | 07.09.2011 | ||
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | FI | 07.09.2011 | |
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | FI | 07.09.2011 | |
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | LT | 07.09.2011 | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH01137832 ; | [Y]JPH10209868 ; | [Y]EP0856947 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-30 * abstract * * figures 2-4 * * column 2, line 38 - line 46 * * column 4, line 55 - column 5, line 24 * * column 7, line 38 - column 9, line 38 *; | [Y]US6317065 (RALEIGH GREGORY G [US], et al) [Y] 1-30 * abstract * * figures 2,3 * * column 2, line 43 - line 52 * * column 4, line 23 - line 29 ** column 5, line 23 - line 30 *; | [Y]US6407689 (BAZARJANI SEYFOLLAH [US], et al) [Y] 1-30 * abstract * * figures 11,13 * * column 2, line 17 - line 22 * * column 2, line 46 - line 53 * * column 21, line 5 - column 22, line 30 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890829), vol. 013, no. 390, Database accession no. (E - 813), & JP01137832 A 19890530 (SONY CORP) [Y] 1-30 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981130), vol. 1998, no. 13, & JP10209868 A 19980807 (CANON INC) [Y] 1-30 * abstract * |