EP1800358 - METHOD FOR MAKING ELECTRONIC DEVICES HAVING A DIELECTRIC LAYER SURFACE TREATMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.07.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.08.2012 [2012/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul MN 55133-3427 / US | ||
Former [2007/26] | For all designated states 3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES COMPANY Office of Intellectual Property Counsel 3M Center, Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUNBAR, Timothy D., 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
KELLEY, Tommie W., 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [2007/26] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/26] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05790788.3 | 26.08.2005 | [2007/26] | WO2005US30412 | Priority number, date | US20040954413 | 30.09.2004 Original published format: US 954413 | [2007/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006039019 | Date: | 13.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1800358 | Date: | 27.06.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01L51/00 | [2007/26] | CPC: |
H10K10/468 (EP,US);
H10K99/00 (KR);
H10K10/466 (EP,US);
H01L21/02118 (EP,US);
H01L21/0212 (EP);
H01L21/02274 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ELEKTRONISCHEN BAUELEMENTEN MIT EINER OBERFLÄCHENBEHANDLUNG DIELEKTRISCHER SCHICHTEN | [2007/26] | English: | METHOD FOR MAKING ELECTRONIC DEVICES HAVING A DIELECTRIC LAYER SURFACE TREATMENT | [2007/26] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE DISPOSITIFS ELECTRONIQUES COMPRENANT UN TRAITEMENT DE SURFACE DE COUCHE DIELECTRIQUE | [2007/26] | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.07.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/26] | 26.04.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/35] | 10.04.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/35] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.04.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2011 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO03019631 (GRACEL CO LTD [KR], et al); | [X]EP1443571 (PIONEER CORP [JP]); | by applicant | WO03019631 | EP1443571 |