EP1776683 - SECURE MONITORING TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.06.2010 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.07.2010 [2010/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aberlenc, Frédéric 125 Route d'Aix 13510 Eguilles / FR | [2007/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2007/17] | Representative(s) | Renaud-Goud, Thierry Renaud-Goud Conseil 5, rue de Montigny 13100 Aix-en-Provence / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/17] | Renaud-Goud, Thierry Renaud-Goud Conseil 5, rue de Montigny F-13100 Aix-en-Provence / FR | Application number, filing date | 05791025.9 | 20.07.2005 | [2007/17] | WO2005FR01876 | Priority number, date | FR20040007993 | 20.07.2004 Original published format: FR 0407993 | [2007/17] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006018510 | Date: | 23.02.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1776683 | Date: | 25.04.2007 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G08B25/01, G08B25/10 | [2007/17] | CPC: |
G08B21/0269 (EP,US);
G08B25/007 (EP,US);
G08B25/016 (EP,US);
G08B25/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GESICHERTES ÜBERWACHUNGSENDGERÄT | [2007/17] | English: | SECURE MONITORING TERMINAL | [2007/17] | French: | TERMINAL DE SURVEILLANCE SECURISE | [2007/17] | Entry into regional phase | 23.01.2007 | National basic fee paid | 23.01.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.01.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/17] | 02.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/29] | 05.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2009 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US6377165 (YOSHIOKA KENJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-18 * column 4, line 51 - column 6, line 31 * * column 6, line 63 - column 7, line 21 * * column 8, line 52 - column 9, line 12 * * column 14, line 1 - line 20 * * column 14, line 34 - line 37 * * figures 1-6 *; | [X]US2003151507 (ANDRE PAUL [US], et al) [X] 1-18 * paragraphs [0023] , [0025] , [0032] , [0034] , [0038] , [0046] * * figures 1-3 * |