EP1796479 - PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF VEGETABLE PRESERVES CONTAINING PROBIOTIC MICROORGANISMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.08.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.09.2015 [2015/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CONSIGLIO NAZIONALE DELLE RICERCHE Piazzale Aldo Moro, 7 00185 Roma / IT | [2007/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAVERMICOCCA, Paola, Istituto di Scienze delle Produzioni Alimentari, Via Amendola, 122/0 70126 Bari / IT | 02 /
LONIGRO, Stella Lisa, Istituto di Scienze delle Produzioni Alimentari, Via Amendola, 122/O 70126 Bari / IT | 03 /
VALERIO, Francesca, Istituto di Scienze delle Produzioni Alimentari, Via Amendola, 122/O 70126 Bari / IT | 04 /
VISCONTI, Angelo, Istituto di Scienze delle Produzioni Alimentari, Via Amendola, 122/O 70126 Bari / IT | 05 /
VANADIA, Sebastiano, Istituto di Scienze delle Produzioni Alimentari, Via Amendola, 122/O 70126 Bari / IT | 06 /
CALABRESE, Nicola, Istituto di Scienze delle Produzioni Alimentari, Via Amendola, 122/O 70126 Bari / IT | 07 /
MORELLI, Lorenzo, Istituto di Scienze delle Produzioni Alimentari, Via Amendola, 122/O 70126 Bari / IT | 08 /
DI VENERE, Donato Istituto di Scienze delle Produzioni Alimentari Via Amendola, 122/O 70126 Bari / IT | [2009/30] |
Former [2007/25] | 01 /
LAVERMICOCCA, Paola, Istituto di Scienze delle Produzioni Alimentari, Via Amendola, 122/0 70126 Bari / IT | ||
02 /
LONIGRO, Stella Lisa, Istituto di Scienze delle Produzioni Alimentari, Via Amendola, 122/O 70126 Bari / IT | |||
03 /
VALERIO, Francesca, Istituto di Scienze delle Produzioni Alimentari, Via Amendola, 122/O 70126 Bari / IT | |||
04 /
VISCONTI, Angelo, Istituto di Scienze delle Produzioni Alimentari, Via Amendola, 122/O 70126 Bari / IT | |||
05 /
VANADIA, Sebastiano, Istituto di Scienze delle Produzioni Alimentari, Via Amendola, 122/O 70126 Bari / IT | |||
06 /
CALABRESE, Nicola, Istituto di Scienze delle Produzioni Alimentari, Via Amendola, 122/O 70126 Bari / IT | |||
07 /
MORELLI, Lorenzo, Istituto di Scienze delle Produzioni Alimentari, Via Amendola, 122/O 70126 Bari / IT | Representative(s) | Nemni, Raffaello, et al Via Roma, 12 21047 Saronno / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2011/32] | Nemni, Raffaelo, et al Via Roma, 12 21047 Saronno / IT | ||
Former [2007/25] | Nemni, Raffaelo Studio Legale Nemni Via San Marco, 23 20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 05791712.2 | 27.09.2005 | [2007/25] | WO2005EP10413 | Priority number, date | IT2004MI01887 | 05.10.2004 Original published format: IT MI20041887 | [2007/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006037517 | Date: | 13.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1796479 | Date: | 20.06.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A23B7/154, A23B7/155, A23B7/157 | [2007/25] | CPC: |
A23B7/154 (EP,US);
A23B7/155 (EP,US);
A23B7/157 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/25] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON GEMÜSEKONSERVEN MIT PROBIOTISCHEN MIKROORGANISMEN | [2007/25] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF VEGETABLE PRESERVES CONTAINING PROBIOTIC MICROORGANISMS | [2007/25] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE CONSERVES DE LEGUMES CONTENANT DES MICRO-ORGANISMES PROBIOTIQUES | [2007/25] | Entry into regional phase | 24.10.2006 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.10.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.10.2006 | Examination requested [2007/25] | 05.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/40] | 27.05.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.09.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2013 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   28.03.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US5192565 (BUHLER MARCEL [US], et al) [X] 10,14 * claims 1,12 * * column 2, lines 17-42 * * example 1 * * column 2, lines 53-56 * * column 3, lines 8-12 * [Y] 1,3,4,6,8,10,12; | [Y]US4911940 (STEINER FERDINAND [US], et al) [Y] 1,3,4,6,8,10,12 * claim 1 *; | [XY]US6500476 (MARTIN STEFAN T [US], et al) [X] 10 * claim 1 * * claims 1,6 * [Y] 1,3,6,8,12; | [XY]US4818549 (STEINER FERDINAND [US], et al) [X] 10 * claim 1 * [Y] 1,3,6,8,12; | [X]US3932674 (ETCHELLS JOHN L, et al) [X] 10,14 * the whole document *; | [X]US3891771 (GREEN DAN E, et al) [X] 10,14 * the whole document *; | [A]US3403032 (ETCHELLS JOHN L, et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document * | [X] - JOSHI V K ET AL, Lactic acid fermentation of mushroom (agaricus bisporus) for preservation and preparation of sauce, ACTA ALIMENTARIA, AKADEMIAI KRADO. BUDAPEST, HU, PAGE(S) 1-11, (1996), ISSN 0139-3006, XP002974529 [X] 10,14 * the whole document * | [X] - RUIZ-BARBA J L ET AL, USE OF LACTOBACILLUS PLANTARUM LPCO10, A BACTERIOCIN PRODUCER, AS ASTARTER CULTURE IN SPANISH-STYLE GREEN OLIVE FERMENTATIONS, APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, WASHINGTON,DC, US, PAGE(S) 2059-2064, (199406), ISSN 0099-2240, XP000983589 [X] 10,14 * the whole document * | [X] - SUSKOVIC J ET AL, PROBIOTIC PROPERTIES OF LACTOBACILLUS PLANTARUM L4, FOOD TECHNOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, ZAGREB, HR, PAGE(S) 107-112, (1997), ISSN 1330-9862, XP009046128 [X] 10,14 * the whole document * |