EP1832369 - STAINLESS STEEL BAND SAW FOR CUTTING AND QUARTERING FOOD PRODUCTS, SUCH AS MEAT, FISH AND SIMILAR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.12.2016 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.01.2017 [2017/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gallego Cozar, Amable C/ Martinez de la Ossa N°2 02080 Albacete / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2016/33] | For all designated states Gallego Cozar, Amable Bravo Murillo n° 373, 3°A 28020 Madrid / ES | ||
Former [2007/37] | For all designated states Gallego Cozar, Amable Martinez de la Osa, 2 02080 Albacete / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2007/37] | Representative(s) | González-Mogena González, Inigo, et al Patentes Y Marcas Bravo Murillo n°373, 3°A 28020 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2011/11] | Gonzalez-Mogena Gonzalez, Inigo, et al Velazquez Núm. 75, 1° 28006 Madrid / ES | ||
Former [2007/37] | Gonzalez-Mogena Gonzalez, Inigo, et al Gonzalez Mogena Patentes y Marcas C/ Monte Esquinza No. 26-3o Dcha. 28010 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 05791962.3 | 13.09.2005 | [2007/37] | WO2005ES00492 | Priority number, date | ES20040002181 | 13.09.2004 Original published format: ES 200402181 | [2007/37] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006037821 | Date: | 13.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1832369 | Date: | 12.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 13.04.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B23D61/12, B23D65/00, A22B5/20, B23K26/00, B23K15/00 | [2007/37] | CPC: |
B23D61/12 (EP);
A22B5/20 (EP,ES);
A22B5/208 (EP);
B23D61/125 (ES);
B23D65/00 (EP,ES);
B23K15/0006 (EP,ES);
B23K15/0053 (EP);
B23K26/00 (ES);
B23K26/24 (EP);
B23K26/32 (EP);
B23K26/323 (EP);
B23K31/025 (EP);
B23K2101/20 (EP);
B23K2103/04 (EP);
B23K2103/05 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BANDSÄGE AUS ROSTFREIEM STAHL ZUM SCHNEIDEN UND VIERTEILEN VON LEBENSMITTELN, WIE FLEISCH, FISCH UND DERGLEICHEN | [2007/37] | English: | STAINLESS STEEL BAND SAW FOR CUTTING AND QUARTERING FOOD PRODUCTS, SUCH AS MEAT, FISH AND SIMILAR | [2007/37] | French: | LAME DE SCIE EN ACIER INOXYDABLE PERMETTANT DE COUPER ET DE DEPECER DES PRODUITS ALIMENTAIRES TELS QUE LES VIANDES, LES POISSONS ET AUTRES PRODUITS SEMBLABLES | [2007/37] | Entry into regional phase | 12.04.2007 | Translation filed | 12.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 24.07.2007 | Search fee paid | 12.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/37] | 12.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/04] | 10.10.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2009 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   28.10.2009 | 30.09.2013 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   10.03.2014 | 30.09.2014 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   12.03.2015 | 30.09.2015 | 11   M06   Not yet paid | 30.09.2016 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO0235002 (THERMO WEB SYSTEMS INC [US]); | [Y]AT409599B (BOEHLER YBBSTAL BAND GMBH & CO [AT]); | [Y]EP1332822 (SWAROVSKI TYROLIT SCHLEIF [AT]) | International search | [A]US3104562 (KOLESH VICTOR A); | [A]US5015539 (DAXELMUELLER MANFRED [AT], et al); | [A]US5417777 (HENDERER WILLARD E [US]); | [A]US5955208 (TAKAHASHI MASAO [JP]); | [A]WO0102118 (C4 CARBIDES PLC [GB], et al); | [A]DE20100127U (RABIED DIAMANTTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) |