EP1814763 - Method and system for providing internal diagnostic informations in a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/32] | DIAGNOSTIC INTERFACE FOR A SERVICE GATEWAY APPLICATIONS | ||
[2012/26] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.09.2013 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.10.2013 [2013/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2007/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOER, Gerrit De Sohldfeld 219 31139 Hildesheim / DE | 02 /
KOPMANN, Wolfgang Siegfried-Kampf-Str. 9 31139 Hildesheim / DE | 03 /
ENGEL, Peter Konrad-Adenauer-Str. 6 31139 Hildesheim / DE | [2007/32] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/46] | Application number, filing date | 05792101.7 | 20.09.2005 | [2007/32] | WO2005EP54675 | Priority number, date | DE20041055573 | 18.11.2004 Original published format: DE102004055573 | [2007/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006053797 | Date: | 26.05.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/21] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1814763 | Date: | 08.08.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1814763 | Date: | 14.11.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/66, H04L29/08, B60R16/023, G07C5/08, G01M17/00, G05B23/00 | [2012/26] | CPC: |
H04L67/125 (EP,US);
H04L67/12 (EP,US);
H04L67/34 (EP,US);
B60W2050/021 (EP,US);
B60W2050/046 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/32] | B60R16/02, G07C5/08, G01M17/00, G05B23/00, H04L12/66 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2007/36] |
Former [2007/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur Bereitstellung von internen diagnoserelevanten Informationen in einem Fahrzeug | [2012/26] | English: | Method and system for providing internal diagnostic informations in a vehicle | [2012/26] | French: | Procédé et système pour mettre à disposition des données internes et pertinantes pour le diagnostique d'un véhicule | [2012/31] |
Former [2007/32] | DIAGNOSESCHNITTSTELLE FÜR APPLIKATIONEN AUF EINEM SERVICE GATEWAY | ||
Former [2007/32] | DIAGNOSTIC INTERFACE FOR A SERVICE GATEWAY APPLICATIONS | ||
Former [2007/32] | INTERFACE DE DIAGNOSTIC POUR APPLICATIONS SUR UNE PASSERELLE DE SERVICES | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 25.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/36] | 30.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.06.2011 | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 25.02.2013 | [2013/23] | Cited in | International search | [X]DE10254284 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0005] - [0013] - [0018] - [0020] *; | [X]DE10237717 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0009] , [0010] , [0012] *; | [PX]DE10348209 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [PX] 1-12 * paragraphs [0042] - [0049] - [0054] *; | [A]DE19750662 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-12 * column 4, line 24 * * column 4, line 53 - column 5, line 23 * * column 6, lines 33-47,61-66; figures 1-10 *; | [A]DE10257030 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-12 * column 3, lines 39-43 * * column 7, lines 63,64 * | Examination | WO2006044128 | WO0126338 | DE10135898 | DE102004035793 | by applicant | DE10254284 | WO2006044128 | WO0126338 |