EP1915940 - A DUST REMOVING APPLIANCE OF A PARALLEL TYPE CLEANER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.01.2012 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Suzhou Kingclean Floorcare Co., Ltd. No. 1 Xiangyang Rd., New District, Suzhou Jiangsu 215009 / CN | [2008/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NI, Zugen No. 1 Xiang Yang Road Suzhou New District Suzhou Jiangsu 215009 / CN | [2008/18] | Representative(s) | Fink, Stefan D., et al Fink Numrich Patentanwälte Wendl-Dietrich-Strasse 14 80634 München / DE | [2008/18] | Application number, filing date | 05792166.0 | 26.09.2005 | [2008/18] | WO2005CN01577 | Priority number, date | CN2005141555 | 19.08.2005 Original published format: CN200510041555 | [2008/18] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007019740 | Date: | 22.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1915940 | Date: | 30.04.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1915940 | Date: | 02.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 22.02.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A47L9/16, B01D45/16, B04C3/04 | [2008/18] | CPC: |
B04C5/28 (EP);
A47L9/1633 (EP);
A47L9/1641 (EP);
A47L9/165 (EP);
A47L9/1683 (EP);
B01D45/12 (EP);
B01D45/16 (EP);
B04C5/04 (EP);
B04C5/13 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STAUBENTFERNUNGSVORRICHTUNG EINER PARALLELARTIGEN REINIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2008/18] | English: | A DUST REMOVING APPLIANCE OF A PARALLEL TYPE CLEANER | [2008/18] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DEPOUSSIERAGE D UN APPAREIL DE NETTOYAGE DE TYPE PARALLELE | [2008/18] | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.2007 | Translation filed | 30.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 30.07.2007 | Search fee paid | 30.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.07.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.07.2007 | Examination requested [2008/18] | 16.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.03.2011 | BE | 02.03.2011 | CY | 02.03.2011 | CZ | 02.03.2011 | DK | 02.03.2011 | EE | 02.03.2011 | FI | 02.03.2011 | HU | 02.03.2011 | IT | 02.03.2011 | LT | 02.03.2011 | LV | 02.03.2011 | NL | 02.03.2011 | PL | 02.03.2011 | RO | 02.03.2011 | SE | 02.03.2011 | SI | 02.03.2011 | SK | 02.03.2011 | TR | 02.03.2011 | BG | 02.06.2011 | GR | 03.06.2011 | ES | 13.06.2011 | IS | 02.07.2011 | PT | 04.07.2011 | IE | 26.09.2011 | LU | 26.09.2011 | CH | 30.09.2011 | LI | 30.09.2011 | MC | 30.09.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 02.03.2011 | |
BE | 02.03.2011 | ||
CY | 02.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2011 | ||
DK | 02.03.2011 | ||
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
IT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
NL | 02.03.2011 | ||
PL | 02.03.2011 | ||
RO | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
TR | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
IS | 02.07.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
IE | 26.09.2011 | ||
LU | 26.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 02.03.2011 | |
BE | 02.03.2011 | ||
CY | 02.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2011 | ||
DK | 02.03.2011 | ||
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
IT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
NL | 02.03.2011 | ||
PL | 02.03.2011 | ||
RO | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
IS | 02.07.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
IE | 26.09.2011 | ||
LU | 26.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/35] | AT | 02.03.2011 | |
BE | 02.03.2011 | ||
CY | 02.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2011 | ||
DK | 02.03.2011 | ||
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
IT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
NL | 02.03.2011 | ||
PL | 02.03.2011 | ||
RO | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
IS | 02.07.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
IE | 26.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/33] | AT | 02.03.2011 | |
BE | 02.03.2011 | ||
CY | 02.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2011 | ||
DK | 02.03.2011 | ||
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
IT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
NL | 02.03.2011 | ||
PL | 02.03.2011 | ||
RO | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
IS | 02.07.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/24] | AT | 02.03.2011 | |
BE | 02.03.2011 | ||
CY | 02.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2011 | ||
DK | 02.03.2011 | ||
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
IT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
NL | 02.03.2011 | ||
PL | 02.03.2011 | ||
RO | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
IS | 02.07.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 02.03.2011 | |
BE | 02.03.2011 | ||
CY | 02.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2011 | ||
DK | 02.03.2011 | ||
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
NL | 02.03.2011 | ||
PL | 02.03.2011 | ||
RO | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
IS | 02.07.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 02.03.2011 | |
BE | 02.03.2011 | ||
CY | 02.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2011 | ||
DK | 02.03.2011 | ||
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
NL | 02.03.2011 | ||
PL | 02.03.2011 | ||
RO | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
IS | 02.07.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | AT | 02.03.2011 | |
BE | 02.03.2011 | ||
CY | 02.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2011 | ||
DK | 02.03.2011 | ||
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
NL | 02.03.2011 | ||
RO | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
IS | 02.07.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | AT | 02.03.2011 | |
BE | 02.03.2011 | ||
CY | 02.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2011 | ||
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
NL | 02.03.2011 | ||
RO | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
IS | 02.07.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 02.03.2011 | |
BE | 02.03.2011 | ||
CY | 02.03.2011 | ||
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
NL | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/41] | AT | 02.03.2011 | |
BE | 02.03.2011 | ||
CY | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
NL | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/39] | AT | 02.03.2011 | |
CY | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
NL | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 02.03.2011 | |
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | LT | 02.03.2011 | |
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2326360 (NOTETRY LTD [GB]) [A] 1,2,4-6 * figure - *; | [A]US2001054213 (OH JANG-KEUN [KR], et al) [A] 1,2 * figures 2,3,6,7 *; | [A]US2003200736 (NI ZUGEN [CN]) [A] 3* paragraph [0025]; figure 1 *; | [A]JP2004135700 (TOSHIBA TEC KK) [A] 1 * abstract * | International search | [A]US4373228 (DYSON JAMES [GB]); | [A]CN2152593Y (INST OF METALLURG BAOTOU IRON [CN]); | [A]CN1312049 (MEIDI GROUP CORP LTD GUANGDONG [CN]); | [Y]CN1377627 (JINLAIKE CLEANING APPARATUS CO [CN]); | [X]US2004040270 (INOUE MINEYUKI [JP], et al) | by applicant | GB2326360 | JP2004135700 |