EP1812230 - A METHOD OF PRODUCING A BLANK OF PACKAGING LAMINATE AS WELL AS A THUS PRODUCED BLANK AND A PACKAGING CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.01.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tetra Laval Holdings & Finance SA Avenue Général-Guisan 70 1009 Pully / CH | [2011/11] |
Former [2011/11] | For all designated states Tetra Laval Holdings & Finance SA Avenue Général-Guisan 70 P.O. Box 430 1009 Pully / CH | ||
Former [2007/31] | For all designated states Tetra Laval Holdings & Finance SA Avenue Général-Guisan 70 1009 Pully / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDERSSON, Bengt Västervångsgatan 22 S-217 74 Malmö / SE | 02 /
KJELGAARD, Tom Iliongränden 221 S-224 72 Lund / SE | [2007/31] | Representative(s) | Sundell, Håkan Oskar Anders AB Tetra Pak Ruben Rausings gata 221 86 Lund / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/31] | Sundell, Hakan Oskar Anders AB Tetra Pak Ruben Rausings gata 221 86 Lund / SE | Application number, filing date | 05792377.3 | 14.10.2005 | [2007/31] | WO2005SE01531 | Priority number, date | SE20040002752 | 09.11.2004 Original published format: SE 0402752 | [2007/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006052179 | Date: | 18.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1812230 | Date: | 01.08.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1812230 | Date: | 16.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 18.05.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B32B3/08, B31B7/00, // B32B15/08, B32B27/08, B32B27/10, B32B29/00 | [2009/45] | CPC: |
B32B29/00 (EP,US);
B31B50/81 (SE);
B29C65/36 (SE);
B31B50/60 (SE);
B32B15/08 (EP,US);
B32B27/08 (EP,US);
B32B27/10 (EP,US);
B32B3/04 (EP,US);
B32B3/08 (EP,US);
B65B51/22 (SE);
B65D81/3446 (SE);
B29C65/3644 (EP,US);
B29C65/368 (EP,US);
B29C65/4815 (EP,US);
B29C65/52 (EP,US);
B29C66/1122 (EP,US);
B29C66/43 (EP,US);
B29C66/433 (EP,US);
B29C66/472 (EP,US);
B29C66/742 (EP,US);
B29C66/83413 (EP,US);
B29C66/83415 (EP,US);
B29K2023/00 (EP,US);
B29K2023/06 (EP,US);
B29K2023/086 (EP,US);
B29K2023/12 (EP,US);
B29K2067/00 (EP,US);
B29K2077/00 (EP,US);
B29K2105/0079 (EP,US);
B29K2105/0085 (EP,US);
B29K2223/00 (EP,US);
B29K2305/00 (EP,US);
B29K2305/02 (EP,US);
B29K2995/0067 (EP,US);
B29K2995/0069 (EP,US);
B29L2031/712 (EP,US);
B31B2105/001 (EP,US);
B32B2250/44 (EP,US);
B32B2255/10 (EP,US);
B32B2255/26 (EP,US);
B32B2307/306 (EP,US);
B32B2307/31 (EP,US);
B32B2307/7246 (EP,US);
B32B2307/7265 (EP,US);
B32B2439/40 (EP,US);
B32B2439/70 (EP,US);
Y10T428/13 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1303 (EP,US);
Y10T428/131 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1334 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1352 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1359 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2007/31] | B32B3/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES VERPACKUNGSLAMINATROHLINGS SOWIE SO HERGESTELLTER ROHLING UND VERPACKUNGSBEHÄLTER | [2007/31] | English: | A METHOD OF PRODUCING A BLANK OF PACKAGING LAMINATE AS WELL AS A THUS PRODUCED BLANK AND A PACKAGING CONTAINER | [2007/31] | French: | METHODE DE PRODUCTION D'UN FLAN DE STRATIFIE DE CONDITIONNEMENT, FLAN ET CONTENANT DE CONDITIONNEMENT PRODUITS PAR CETTE METHODE | [2007/31] | Entry into regional phase | 11.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 11.06.2007 | Search fee paid | 11.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/31] | 04.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 16.03.2011 | CY | 16.03.2011 | CZ | 16.03.2011 | DK | 16.03.2011 | EE | 16.03.2011 | HU | 16.03.2011 | IT | 16.03.2011 | LT | 16.03.2011 | LV | 16.03.2011 | PL | 16.03.2011 | RO | 16.03.2011 | SE | 16.03.2011 | SI | 16.03.2011 | SK | 16.03.2011 | TR | 16.03.2011 | BG | 16.06.2011 | GR | 17.06.2011 | ES | 27.06.2011 | IS | 16.07.2011 | PT | 18.07.2011 | GB | 14.10.2011 | IE | 14.10.2011 | LU | 14.10.2011 | CH | 31.10.2011 | LI | 31.10.2011 | MC | 31.10.2011 | FR | 02.11.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | BE | 16.03.2011 | |
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
DK | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
IT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
PL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
TR | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
GB | 14.10.2011 | ||
IE | 14.10.2011 | ||
LU | 14.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
FR | 02.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | BE | 16.03.2011 | |
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
DK | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
IT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
PL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
GB | 14.10.2011 | ||
IE | 14.10.2011 | ||
LU | 14.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
FR | 02.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/47] | BE | 16.03.2011 | |
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
DK | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
IT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
PL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
GB | 14.10.2011 | ||
IE | 14.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
FR | 02.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 16.03.2011 | |
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
DK | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
IT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
PL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
GB | 14.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
FR | 02.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 16.03.2011 | |
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
DK | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
IT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
PL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
GB | 14.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/33] | BE | 16.03.2011 | |
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
DK | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
IT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
PL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/25] | BE | 16.03.2011 | |
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
DK | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
IT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
PL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | BE | 16.03.2011 | |
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
DK | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
IT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
PL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | BE | 16.03.2011 | |
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
DK | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
PL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | BE | 16.03.2011 | |
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
DK | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | BE | 16.03.2011 | |
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | BE | 16.03.2011 | |
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/41] | BE | 16.03.2011 | |
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 16.03.2011 | |
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | LT | 16.03.2011 | |
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2004017449 ; | [X]EP0353100 (ELOPAK SYSTEMS [CH]) [X] 14-18,23 * column 1, line 7 - line 10 * * column 4, line 8 - column 5, line 64 ** column 7, line 6 - line 13 *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2004, no. 27, Database accession no. 2004-286679, XP002548066 & JP2004017449 A 20040122 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 1-23 * abstract * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0059] * | International search | [A]AU2003281614 ; | [A]AU2003289167 ; | [A]US3528867 (LEATHERMAN ALFRED F, et al); | [A]EP0378880 (SHIKOKU KAKOKI CO LTD [JP]); | [A]US5622780 (PALEARI MARIO [IT]); | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2004, no. 50, Database accession no. 2004-143225, XP008113650 & AU2003281614 A1 20040209 (TETRALAVAL HOLDINGS & FINANCE SA) | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2005, no. 01, Database accession no. 2004-690200, XP008113648 & AU2003289167 A1 20040917 (TETRA LAVAL HOLDINGS & FINANCE SA ET AL) |