EP1800382 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROVIDING UNINTERRUPTIBLE POWER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.08.2012 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states American Power Conversion Corporation 132 Fairgrounds Road West Kingston, RI 02892 / US | [2007/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HJORT, Thomas, Enne Solskovvej 36 DK-7100 Vejle / DK | 02 /
NIELSEN, Henning, Roar Aabakkevej 14 DK-5464 Brenderup / DK | 03 /
PEDERSEN, Michael Tornumvej 4, Moegelmose DK-6630 Roedding / DK | 04 /
MATHIESEN, Henrik Agtrupvej 7, 2 tv. DK-6000 Kolding / DK | 05 /
OLSEN, Richard, Dyrmose Jenlevej 37, Nyhoejen DK-7100 Vejle / DK | [2007/26] | Representative(s) | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/26] | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 05792383.1 | 30.08.2005 | [2007/26] | WO2005US30664 | Priority number, date | US20040930691 | 31.08.2004 Original published format: US 930691 | US20040930734 | 31.08.2004 Original published format: US 930734 | US20040931284 | 31.08.2004 Original published format: US 931284 | US20040930692 | 31.08.2004 Original published format: US 930692 | [2007/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006026549 | Date: | 09.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1800382 | Date: | 27.06.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1800382 | Date: | 05.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H02J9/06, H02J7/34 | [2007/26] | CPC: |
H02J9/062 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/26] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG EINER UNUNTERBRECHBAREN STROMVERSORGUNG | [2007/26] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROVIDING UNINTERRUPTIBLE POWER | [2007/26] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL GENERANT UNE ALIMENTATION SANS COUPURE | [2007/26] | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/26] | 13.06.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10188603.4 / EP2287995 | EP10188604.2 / EP2282393 | EP10188611.7 / EP2278686 | EP10188747.9 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 26.11.2010 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.10.2008 | Opposition(s) | 06.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.08.2005 | AT | 05.10.2011 | BE | 05.10.2011 | CY | 05.10.2011 | CZ | 05.10.2011 | EE | 05.10.2011 | FI | 05.10.2011 | IT | 05.10.2011 | LT | 05.10.2011 | LV | 05.10.2011 | NL | 05.10.2011 | PL | 05.10.2011 | RO | 05.10.2011 | SE | 05.10.2011 | SI | 05.10.2011 | SK | 05.10.2011 | TR | 05.10.2011 | BG | 05.01.2012 | GR | 06.01.2012 | IS | 05.02.2012 | PT | 06.02.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 05.10.2011 | |
BE | 05.10.2011 | ||
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
FI | 05.10.2011 | ||
IT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
TR | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 05.10.2011 | |
BE | 05.10.2011 | ||
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
FI | 05.10.2011 | ||
IT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 05.10.2011 | |
BE | 05.10.2011 | ||
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
IT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
IT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 05.10.2011 | |
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | SI | 05.10.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2004120857 ; | [X]JPH11146575 ; | [X]US4673826 (MASSON JAMES H [US]) [X] 54-61,72-79,88-94,99,100 * the whole document *; | [XY]US5126585 (BOYS JOHN T [NZ]) [X] 117,118,129,131,132,143,144 * abstract * [Y] 119-128,130,133-142,145-152; | [A]DE4440529 (HONEYWELL AG [DE]) [A] 1,8,14 * column 2, line 43 - line 57; figure 1 *; | [X]US5616968 (FUJII HIROSHI [JP], et al) [X] 54-61,74-79,90-94 * column 4, lines 4-34; figures 1a,1b,5b,9 * * column 8, line 66 - column 9, line 40 *; | [Y]US5796223 (OHTSUKA MASUHIRO [JP], et al) [Y] 119-128,130,133-142,145-152* column 15, line 49 - column 16, line 65; figures 9,11 *; | [A]US5998886 (HOSHINO YASUTAKA [JP], et al) [A] 1,8,14 * column 11, line 32 - column 12, line 33; figure 3 *; | [A]US6184593 (JUNGREIS AARON M [US]) [A] 1,8,14 * figures 4,4a-d *; | [X]US6201319 (SIMONELLI JAMES M [US], et al) [X] 54-62,74-80,90-95 * column 6, line 60 - column 7, line 18; figure 6 *; | [X]US2001033502 (BLAIR CHARLES F [US], et al) [X] 54-100 * paragraphs [0037] , [0038] , [0065] , [0071]; figures 2,3,11 *; | [X]EP1187298 (NIHON PROTECTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 101-116 * paragraph [0045]; figure 1 *; | [A]US2003099371 (OGURA TAKASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,8,14 * abstract *; | [X]US2003111842 (GILBRETH MARK G [US], et al) [X] 22-53 * page 4; figure 3 *; | [A]US2003184160 (YAMAMOTO YUUSHIN [JP]) [A] 1-152 * figure 6 *; | [X]US2004155526 (NADEN MARK [US], et al) [X] 22-53 * paragraphs [0011] , [0023]; figures 1,2 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20031205), vol. 2003, no. 12, & JP2004120857 A 20040415 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD; NIPPON TELEGR & TELEPH CORP | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990831), vol. 1999, no. 10, & JP11146575 A 19990528 (NEC CORP) [X] 54-61,74-79,90-94 * abstract * | by applicant | US5998886 | US6184593 | US2003184160 |