EP1794701 - TRANSMITTING ENHANCED SCANNER SIGNALS ON A SINGLE CHANNEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.07.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Symbol Technologies, Inc. One Symbol Plaza Holtsville, NY 11742-1300 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/24] | For all designated states SYMBOL TECHNOLOGIES, INC. One Symbol Plaza Holtsville New York 11742-1300 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DI FAZIO, Costanzo 22 Skyhaven Drive East Patchogue, NY 11772 / US | 02 /
GIEBEL, James, R. 6 Bittersweet Court Centerport, NY 11721 / US | 03 /
SCHNEIDER, Gary 22 Robert Crescent Stony Brook, NY 11790 / US | 04 /
SCHUESSLER, Frederick P.O. Box 663 Baiting Hollow, NY 11933 / US | [2007/24] | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl H., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Wagner, Karl H., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/24] | Wagner, Karl H., et al WAGNER & GEYER Patentanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05792407.8 | 25.08.2005 | [2007/24] | WO2005US30366 | Priority number, date | US20040930652 | 31.08.2004 Original published format: US 930652 | [2007/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006026410 | Date: | 09.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1794701 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.04.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06K7/10 | [2007/24] | CPC: |
G06K7/1452 (EP,US);
G06K7/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/49] |
Former [2007/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ÜBERTRAGUNG VERBESSERTER ABTASTSIGNALE AN EINEN EINZELKANAL | [2007/24] | English: | TRANSMITTING ENHANCED SCANNER SIGNALS ON A SINGLE CHANNEL | [2007/24] | French: | TRANSMISSION DE SIGNAUX DE SCANNEUR AMELIORES SUR UN SEUL CANAL | [2007/24] | Entry into regional phase | 12.02.2007 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.2007 | Search fee paid | 12.02.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/24] | 28.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/34] | 06.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2009 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6209788 (BRIDGELALL RAJ [US], et al) [X] 1* column 36, line 30 - line 36 *; | [X]US6328214 (AKEL KHALID EL [FR], et al) [X] 1-4,11,14-16,21 * column 5, line 53 - line 67; figures 1,2 * | International search | [X]US5608202 (BRIDGELALL RAJ [US], et al) | by applicant | US6328214 | US6209788 |