EP1789024 - CONTROLLED REGIONAL ORAL DELIVERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.07.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.09.2010 [2010/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Spherics, Inc. 701 George Washington Highway Lincoln, RI 02865 / US | [2007/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATHIOWITZ, Edith 184 Rawson Road Brookline, MA 02445 / US | 02 /
NANGIA, Avinash 4 Salamander Way Sharon Massachusetts 02067 / US | 03 /
JACOB, Jules, S. 95 Lake Ridge Drive Taunton, MA 02780 / US | 04 /
SHAKED, Ze'ev 20 Arnold Palmer Drive San Antonio, TX 78257 / US | 05 /
MOSLEMY, Peyman 1000 Providence Place, Apartment 309 Providence, RI 02903 / US | [2007/51] |
Former [2007/22] | 01 /
MATHIOWITZ, Edith 184 Rawson Road Brookline, MA 02445 / US | ||
02 /
NANGIA, Avinash 80 Caesar Chelor Drive Wrentham, MA 02093 / US | |||
03 /
JACOB, Jules, S. 95 Lake Ridge Drive Taunton, MA 02780 / US | |||
04 /
SHAKED, Ze'ev 20 Arnold Palmer Drive San Antonio, TX 78257 / US | |||
05 /
MOSLEMY, Peyman 1000 Providence Place, Apartment 309 Providence, RI 02903 / US | Representative(s) | Bassett, Richard Simon Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/22] | Bassett, Richard Simon Eric Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 05792479.7 | 29.08.2005 | [2007/22] | WO2005US30552 | Priority number, date | US20040604990P | 27.08.2004 Original published format: US 604990 P | US20040605198P | 27.08.2004 Original published format: US 605198 P | US20040605199P | 27.08.2004 Original published format: US 605199 P | US20040605200P | 27.08.2004 Original published format: US 605200 P | US20040605201P | 27.08.2004 Original published format: US 605201 P | US20040607905P | 08.09.2004 Original published format: US 607905 P | US20050650191P | 04.02.2005 Original published format: US 650191 P | US20050650375P | 04.02.2005 Original published format: US 650375 P | [2007/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006039022 | Date: | 13.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1789024 | Date: | 30.05.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/28 | [2007/22] | CPC: |
A61K9/5031 (EP,US);
A61K31/74 (EP,US);
A61K9/006 (EP,US);
A61K9/1641 (EP,US);
A61K9/2018 (EP,US);
A61K9/2031 (EP,US);
A61K9/204 (EP,US);
A61K9/2054 (EP,US);
A61K9/2086 (EP,US);
A61K9/4891 (EP,US);
A61K9/5084 (EP,US);
A61K9/0092 (EP,US);
A61K9/1652 (EP,US);
A61K9/1676 (EP,US);
A61K9/2077 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GESTEUERTE REGIONALE ORALE ABGABE | [2007/22] | English: | CONTROLLED REGIONAL ORAL DELIVERY | [2007/22] | French: | ADMINISTRATION ORALE REGIONALE CONTROLEE | [2007/22] | Entry into regional phase | 27.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 27.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/22] | 28.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 17.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/35] | 06.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/35] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 17.04.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 17.04.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2008 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   26.02.2009 | 31.08.2009 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US6391335 (PATHER S INDIRAN [US], et al) [X] 1-34,37,38,43-48 * column 3, line 37 - column 6, line 48; figures 2-4; claims 1,7 * * column 7, lines 30-67 *; | [X]US4615697 (ROBINSON JOSEPH R [US]) [X] 1-5,7-34,37,38,42-48 * figures 4-8; example 12; claims 1-8 *; | [X]US2003059471 (COMPTON BRUCE JON [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7-34,37,38,43-48 * paragraphs [0002] , [0010] , [0033] , [0035] , [0040] - [0044] - [0059] - [0063] - [0093] - [0300] *; | [X]WO9531217 (DUMEX LTD AS [DK], et al) [X] 1,2,4 * page 13, lines 12-25; claim 14 *; | [X]US2003194420 (HOLL RICHARD [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-34,37,38,43-48 * paragraphs [0017] , [0039] , [0049] , [0062] - [0064] - [0077] , [0081]; figure 4; example 9; claims 27,29,60-73,75 *; | [X]US2003219472 (PAULETTI GIOVANNI M [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7-34,37,38,43-48 * paragraphs 2,58,59,66,70,71,83-94,105,120,125,141 - page 142; examples 8-10; claims 3,5,9,22,24-26,29 *; | [A]WO9203124 (ORAMED INC [US]) [A] 1-48 * page 1, lines 14-31 * * page 11, line 28 - page 12, line 27 * * page 13, line 27 - page 16, line 6 * * page 17, lines 11-20 *; | [X]WO0110378 (FUNDACAO OSWALDO CRUZ [BR], et al) [X] 35,36,39-42 * page 1, lines 5-18; examples 3,4; tables 3,4 * * page 7, lines 3-15; table 1 * |