EP1800122 - ANALYTICAL TEST ELEMENT WITH WIRELESS DATA TRANSMISSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.06.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.07.2014 [2014/31] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/08] | For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | |||
Former [2007/26] | For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | ||
For all designated states F. Hoffmann-Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 CH-4070 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROESICKE, Bernd Unter den Birken 6 68305 Mannheim / DE | 02 /
SEIDENSTRICKER, Manfred Mosbacher Strasse 16 68259 Mannheim / DE | [2007/26] | Application number, filing date | 05792596.8 | 07.10.2005 | [2007/26] | WO2005EP10806 | Priority number, date | DE20041048864 | 07.10.2004 Original published format: DE102004048864 | [2007/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006040083 | Date: | 20.04.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1800122 | Date: | 27.06.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/487 | [2007/26] | CPC: |
A61B5/6849 (EP,US);
A61B5/0002 (EP,US);
A61B5/14532 (EP,US);
G01N33/48792 (EP,US);
A61B2560/0219 (EP,US);
A61B2560/0228 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANALYTISCHES TESTELEMENT MIT DRAHTLOSER DATENÜBERTRAGUNG | [2007/26] | English: | ANALYTICAL TEST ELEMENT WITH WIRELESS DATA TRANSMISSION | [2007/26] | French: | ELEMENT D'ESSAI ANALYTIQUE A TRANSMISSION DE DONNEES SANS FIL | [2007/26] | Entry into regional phase | 07.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 07.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/26] | 17.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/31] | 24.03.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.10.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XD]US6217744 (CROSBY PETER [US]) [XD] 2-9 * the whole document *; | [YD]DE10237602 (I E M IND ENTWICKLUNG MEDIZINT [DE], et al) [YD] 2-9 * the whole document *; | [YD]DE10253154 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [YD] 2-9 * the whole document *; | [A]US5580794 (ALLEN MICHAEL P [US]) [A] 2-9 * column 9, line 12 - line 28; figures 1,2 *; | [PA]WO2005024375 (POLYIC GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) [PA] 2 * page 4, line 6 - line 26 * | [A] - "Polytronic: Chips von der Rolle", FRAUNHOFER MAGAZIN, FRAUNHOFER GESELLSCHAFT, MUENCHEN, DE, (2001), no. 4, ISSN 1434-7113, pages 8 - 13, XP002257822 [A] 2-9 * the whole document * |