EP1800226 - PRESENTATION OF SEARCH RESULTS BASED ON DOCUMENT STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.12.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2018 | New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings | 07.12.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.01.2019 [2019/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Google LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2017/45] |
Former [2007/26] | For all designated states Google, Inc. 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SINGHAL, Amitabh K. 2435 Aztec Way Palo Alto, California 94303 / US | 02 /
RATNAKAR, Viresh 718 Old San Francisco Road Apt. 212 Sunnyvale, California 94086 / US | 03 /
LIFANTSEV, Maxim 707 Continental Circle Apt. 1033 Mountain View, California 94040 / US | 04 /
O'SULLIVAN, Joseph Kieran 2 Culebra Terrace San Francisco, California 94109 / US | [2007/26] | Representative(s) | Anderson, Oliver Ben, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/26] | Betten & Resch Patentanwälte, Theatinerstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05792767.5 | 19.08.2005 | [2007/26] | WO2005US29691 | Priority number, date | US20040949708 | 27.09.2004 Original published format: US 949708 | [2007/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006036376 | Date: | 06.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1800226 | Date: | 27.06.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30, G06F17/22 | [2007/26] | CPC: |
G06F16/30 (EP,US);
G06F16/80 (EP,US);
G06F16/951 (EP,US);
G06F40/103 (EP,US);
G06F40/143 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PRÄSENTATION VON SUCHERGEBNISSEN AUF DER BASIS DER DOKUMENTSTRUKTUR | [2007/26] | English: | PRESENTATION OF SEARCH RESULTS BASED ON DOCUMENT STRUCTURE | [2007/26] | French: | PRESENTATION DE RESULTATS DE RECHERCHE SELON LA STRUCTURE D'UN DOCUMENT | [2007/26] | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.04.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/26] | 29.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/02] | 05.12.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 31.01.2019 | 31.01.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.09.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 28.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5943669 (NUMATA KENICHI [JP]) [X] 1,18-23,31-41 * column 5, line 42 - line 53 * * column 8, line 12 - column 15, line 3; figures 1-13 *; | [XA]US6105044 (DEROSE STEVEN [US], et al) [X] 1-17,24-30,42 * column 2, line 7 - column 3, line 3 * * column 13, line 6 - line 21; figures 4,9,10 * * column 17, line 32 - line 48 * [A] 31,41; | [XA]US2004083211 (BRADFORD ROGER BURROWES [US]) [X] 1-17,24-30,42 * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0099] * * paragraph [0118] * * paragraph [0124] - paragraph [0130] * * paragraph [0134] - paragraph [0147] * [A] 31,41; | [XA] - GUO L ET AL, "XRANK: Ranked Keyword Search over XML Documents", PROCEEDINGS OF SIGMOD 2003, San Diego, CA, (20030609), URL: http://www.cs.cornell.edu/People/jai/papers/XRank.pdf, (20051212), XP002359125 [X] 1-17,24-30,42 * the whole document * [A] 31,41 | [XA] - WOLFF J E ET AL, "Searching and browsing collections of structural information", ADVANCES IN DIGITAL LIBRARIES, 2000. PROCEEDINGS. IEEE WASHINGTON, DC, USA 22-24 MAY 2000, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (20000522), ISBN 0-7695-0659-3, pages 141 - 150, XP010501112 [X] 1-17,24-30,42 * abstract * * section "1. Introduction" * * section "3.2 Retrieval Function" * [A] 31,41 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ADL.2000.848377 |