EP1834932 - CHEMICAL PROCESS FOR OBTAINING GLASS WITH A TOTAL OR PARTIAL SATIN/MATT FINISH, COMPRISING IMMERSION IN AN ACID SOLUTION, FOR SIMULTANEOUS AND CONTINUOUS PRODUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.06.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rendon Granados, Juan Luis Fresno 208 Col. Valle Hermoso 38010 Celaya Guanajuato / MX | [2007/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2007/38] | Representative(s) | Temiño Ceniceros, Ignacio Abril Patentes y Marcas, S.L. Calle Zurbano, 76 - 7° 28010 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2011/32] | Temino Ceniceros, Ignacio Abril Abogados Amador de los Rios 1-1° 28010 Madrid / ES | ||
Former [2007/38] | Temino Ceniceros, Ignacio Abril Abogados Calle Amador de los Rios, 1 - 1° 28010 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 05793048.9 | 29.09.2005 | [2007/38] | WO2005MX00087 | Priority number, date | WO2004MX00020 | 10.12.2004 Original published format: PCT/MX2004/000020 | [2007/38] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006062386 | Date: | 15.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1834932 | Date: | 19.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1834932 | Date: | 10.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 15.06.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C03C15/00 | [2007/38] | CPC: |
C03C15/00 (EP,US);
C03B18/00 (KR);
C03B18/16 (KR);
C03B18/18 (KR);
C03C23/0075 (EP,US);
G02B5/08 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CHEMISCHES VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON GLAS MIT VOLLSTÄNDIGEM ODER TEILWEISEM SATIN/MATT-FINISH, UMFASSEND EINTAUCHEN IN EINE SÄURELÖSUNG, ZUR GLEICHZEITIGEN UND KONTINUIERLICHEN PRODUKTION | [2007/38] | English: | CHEMICAL PROCESS FOR OBTAINING GLASS WITH A TOTAL OR PARTIAL SATIN/MATT FINISH, COMPRISING IMMERSION IN AN ACID SOLUTION, FOR SIMULTANEOUS AND CONTINUOUS PRODUCTION | [2007/38] | French: | PROCEDE CHIMIQUE DE SATINAGE-DEPOLISSAGE TOTAL OU PARTIEL DU VERRE PAR IMMERSION DANS UNE SOLUTION ACIDE POUR UNE PRODUCTION SIMULTANEE ET CONTINUE | [2007/38] | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.2007 | Translation filed | 05.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 05.07.2007 | Search fee paid | 05.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.09.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: ES | 05.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/38] | 11.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.02.2011 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 28.02.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP11001074.1 / EP2338848 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.02.2009 | Opposition(s) | 11.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2009 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   05.03.2010 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.08.2011 | BE | 10.08.2011 | CY | 10.08.2011 | CZ | 10.08.2011 | DK | 10.08.2011 | EE | 10.08.2011 | FI | 10.08.2011 | HU | 10.08.2011 | LT | 10.08.2011 | LV | 10.08.2011 | NL | 10.08.2011 | PL | 10.08.2011 | RO | 10.08.2011 | SE | 10.08.2011 | SI | 10.08.2011 | SK | 10.08.2011 | TR | 10.08.2011 | IE | 29.09.2011 | LU | 29.09.2011 | CH | 30.09.2011 | LI | 30.09.2011 | MC | 30.09.2011 | BG | 10.11.2011 | GR | 11.11.2011 | IS | 10.12.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
BE | 10.08.2011 | ||
CY | 10.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2011 | ||
DK | 10.08.2011 | ||
EE | 10.08.2011 | ||
FI | 10.08.2011 | ||
LT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LV | 10.08.2011 | ||
NL | 10.08.2011 | ||
PL | 10.08.2011 | ||
RO | 10.08.2011 | ||
SE | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
SK | 10.08.2011 | ||
TR | 10.08.2011 | ||
IE | 29.09.2011 | ||
LU | 29.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
BG | 10.11.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
IS | 10.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
BE | 10.08.2011 | ||
CY | 10.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2011 | ||
DK | 10.08.2011 | ||
EE | 10.08.2011 | ||
FI | 10.08.2011 | ||
LT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LV | 10.08.2011 | ||
NL | 10.08.2011 | ||
PL | 10.08.2011 | ||
RO | 10.08.2011 | ||
SE | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
SK | 10.08.2011 | ||
IE | 29.09.2011 | ||
LU | 29.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
BG | 10.11.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
IS | 10.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
BE | 10.08.2011 | ||
CY | 10.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2011 | ||
DK | 10.08.2011 | ||
EE | 10.08.2011 | ||
FI | 10.08.2011 | ||
LT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LV | 10.08.2011 | ||
NL | 10.08.2011 | ||
PL | 10.08.2011 | ||
RO | 10.08.2011 | ||
SE | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
SK | 10.08.2011 | ||
IE | 29.09.2011 | ||
LU | 29.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
IS | 10.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/35] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
BE | 10.08.2011 | ||
CY | 10.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2011 | ||
DK | 10.08.2011 | ||
EE | 10.08.2011 | ||
FI | 10.08.2011 | ||
LT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LV | 10.08.2011 | ||
NL | 10.08.2011 | ||
PL | 10.08.2011 | ||
RO | 10.08.2011 | ||
SE | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
SK | 10.08.2011 | ||
IE | 29.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
IS | 10.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/33] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
BE | 10.08.2011 | ||
CY | 10.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2011 | ||
DK | 10.08.2011 | ||
EE | 10.08.2011 | ||
FI | 10.08.2011 | ||
LT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LV | 10.08.2011 | ||
NL | 10.08.2011 | ||
PL | 10.08.2011 | ||
RO | 10.08.2011 | ||
SE | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
SK | 10.08.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
IS | 10.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
BE | 10.08.2011 | ||
CY | 10.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2011 | ||
EE | 10.08.2011 | ||
FI | 10.08.2011 | ||
LT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LV | 10.08.2011 | ||
NL | 10.08.2011 | ||
PL | 10.08.2011 | ||
RO | 10.08.2011 | ||
SE | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
SK | 10.08.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
IS | 10.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
BE | 10.08.2011 | ||
CY | 10.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2011 | ||
FI | 10.08.2011 | ||
LT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LV | 10.08.2011 | ||
NL | 10.08.2011 | ||
PL | 10.08.2011 | ||
SE | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
IS | 10.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
BE | 10.08.2011 | ||
CY | 10.08.2011 | ||
FI | 10.08.2011 | ||
LT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LV | 10.08.2011 | ||
NL | 10.08.2011 | ||
PL | 10.08.2011 | ||
SE | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
IS | 10.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/17] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
BE | 10.08.2011 | ||
CY | 10.08.2011 | ||
FI | 10.08.2011 | ||
LT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LV | 10.08.2011 | ||
NL | 10.08.2011 | ||
PL | 10.08.2011 | ||
SE | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
IS | 10.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
CY | 10.08.2011 | ||
FI | 10.08.2011 | ||
LT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LV | 10.08.2011 | ||
NL | 10.08.2011 | ||
PL | 10.08.2011 | ||
SE | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
IS | 10.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
FI | 10.08.2011 | ||
LT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LV | 10.08.2011 | ||
NL | 10.08.2011 | ||
PL | 10.08.2011 | ||
SE | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
IS | 10.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | FI | 10.08.2011 | |
LT | 10.08.2011 | ||
NL | 10.08.2011 | ||
SE | 10.08.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
IS | 10.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | FI | 10.08.2011 | |
LT | 10.08.2011 | ||
NL | 10.08.2011 | ||
IS | 10.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | LT | 10.08.2011 | |
NL | 10.08.2011 | ||
IS | 10.12.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB1276550 (CRODA BOWMANS CHEMICALS LTD); | [Y]US4086074 (MINOT MICHAEL JAY, et al); | [X]JPH01102401 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [X]WO0190015 (HERAEUS QUARZGLAS [DE], et al) |