EP1811423 - LINKING OPERATION METHOD, AND COMMUNICATION TERMINAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.09.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vodafone Group PLC Vodafone House The Connection Newbury Berkshire RG14 2FN / GB | [2008/08] |
Former [2007/30] | For all designated states Vodafone K.K. 2-5-1, Atago Minato-ku Tokyo 105-6205 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUWAHARA, Masahiko Vodafone K.K., 2-5-1, Atago, Minato-ku Tokyo 1056205 / JP | 02 /
AOKI, Kazuo c/o Vodafone K.K., 2-5-1, Atago, Minato-ku Tokyo 1056205 / JP | 03 /
MATSUMURA, Toshiro c/o Vodafone K.K., 2-5-1, Atago, Minato-ku Tokyo 1056205 / JP | [2007/40] |
Former [2007/30] | 01 /
KUWAHARA, Tokuya c/o Vodafone K.K., 2-5-1, Atago, Minato-ku, Tokyo 1056205 / JP | ||
02 /
AOKI, Kazuo c/o Vodafone K.K., 2-5-1, Atago, Minato-ku, Tokyo 1056205 / JP | |||
03 /
MATSUMURA, Toshiro c/o Vodafone K.K., 2-5-1, Atago, Minato-ku, Tokyo 1056205 / JP | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/38] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Grays Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2008/09] | Sneary, Adrian Bernard, et al Vodafone Group Services Limited Vodafone Group Legal Vodafone House The Connection Newbury Berkshire RG14 2FN / GB | ||
Former [2007/30] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05793371.5 | 17.10.2005 | [2007/30] | WO2005JP19004 | Priority number, date | JP20040300872 | 15.10.2004 Original published format: JP 2004300872 | [2007/30] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006041179 | Date: | 20.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1811423 | Date: | 25.07.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.04.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/22, H04B7/26, H04M1/725 | [2011/40] | CPC: |
H04M1/72403 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/30] | G06F21/22, H04B7/26, H04M1/00, H04Q7/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERKNÜPFUNGSOPERATIONSVERFAHREN UND KOMMUNIKATIONS-ENDGERÄTEEINRICHTUNG | [2007/30] | English: | LINKING OPERATION METHOD, AND COMMUNICATION TERMINAL DEVICE | [2007/30] | French: | MÉTHODE DE LIAISON ET DISPOSITIF TERMINAL DE COMMUNICATION | [2007/30] | Entry into regional phase | 12.04.2007 | Translation filed | 12.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 12.04.2007 | Search fee paid | 12.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/30] | 19.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/41] | 07.06.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/41] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 19.07.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 19.07.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.08.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2016 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002103003 (MAURO ANTHONY PATRICK [US]) [A] 1-20* paragraphs [0039] - [0042] *; | [X]WO2004040923 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [X] 1-20 * page 6, paragraphs 1-2 * * page 12, paragraph 3 * * page 13, paragraph 2 * * page 16, paragraph 1 - page 19, paragraph 1 * * page 20, paragraph 2; figures 2,5 * | International search | [Y]JPH08263440 (XEROX CORP); | [Y]JP2000122977 (XEROX CORP); | [Y]JP2003533815 ; | [Y]WO2004006166 (ONTARIO INC 2012244 [CA], et al); | [Y]JP2004199301 (RENESAS TECH CORP) | by applicant | WO2004040923 |