EP1788986 - METHOD OF TREATING SPINAL INTERNAL DISK DERANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.07.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Spineovations, Inc. 5870 Pacific Center Blvd. San Diego CA 92101 / US | [2007/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALLEYNE, Neville 9860 La Jolla Farms Road La Jolla, California 92037 / US | 02 /
YOUNG, Stuart 655 Zuni Drive Del Mar, California 92014 / US | [2007/22] | Representative(s) | Fennell, Gareth Charles, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/22] | Fennell, Gareth Charles, et al Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05794686.5 | 30.08.2005 | [2007/22] | WO2005US31225 | Priority number, date | US20040605709P | 30.08.2004 Original published format: US 605709 P | [2007/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006026731 | Date: | 09.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1788986 | Date: | 30.05.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/44 | [2007/22] | CPC: |
A61F2/442 (EP,US);
A61B17/7061 (US);
A61B17/7094 (US);
A61F2/4455 (US);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61F2002/30062 (US);
A61F2002/3008 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30242 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30754 (US);
A61F2002/4435 (EP,US);
A61F2002/444 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0071 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON BANDSCHEIBENSTÖRUNGEN | [2007/22] | English: | METHOD OF TREATING SPINAL INTERNAL DISK DERANGEMENT | [2007/22] | French: | METHODE DE TRAITEMENT DU DEPLACEMENT D'UN DISQUE VERTEBRAL INTERNE | [2007/22] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/22] | 19.04.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/34] | 08.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2009 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DXA]US5344452 (LEMPERLE MARTIN [DE]) [DX] 19,20 * claims 1-7 *[A] 17; | [XA]WO0240070 (BIOSYNTECH CANADA INC [CA], et al) [X] 19-21 * claims 1,12,13,22,23 * * page 16, line 5 - line 8 * [A] 17,18; | [X]US2004024465 (LAMBRECHT GREGORY [US], et al) [X] 17-20 * figures 8,23a-c; claims 1,7,27 * * paragraphs [0087] - [0091] - [0109] , [0133] *; | [XA]US2004054414 (TRIEU HAI H [US], et al) [X] 17-19 * figure -; claims 1-6,9,10,13-19 * * paragraphs [0025] , [0035] - [0037] - [0044] , [0055] , [0063] * [A] 21 |