EP1805642 - SEPARABLE URL INTERNET BROWSER-BASED GAMING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.09.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bally Gaming Inc. 6601 South Bermuda Road Las Vegas, NV 89119 / US | [2007/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DIMICHELE, Carmen 2552 Cosimo Court Sparks, NV 89434 / US | 02 /
RISTINE, Russell 3000 West Plumb Lane Reno, NV 89509 / US | 03 /
MORROW, James, W. 5032 Pleasant View Drive Sparks, NV 89434 / US | [2007/28] | Representative(s) | Carter, Stephen John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Carter, Stephen John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | ||
Former [2008/50] | Carter, Stephen John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [2008/47] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2007/28] | Harrison, Robert John, et al Sonnenberg Fortmann Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 08 65 80068 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05794964.6 | 07.09.2005 | [2007/28] | WO2005US31637 | Priority number, date | US20040956398 | 30.09.2004 Original published format: US 956398 | [2007/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006039067 | Date: | 13.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1805642 | Date: | 11.07.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1805642 | Date: | 03.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.01.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/16 | [2007/28] | CPC: |
A63F13/12 (EP);
G06F15/16 (KR);
A63F13/335 (EP,US);
A63F13/30 (EP);
A63F13/33 (US);
A63F13/35 (US);
A63F13/352 (EP);
A63F13/85 (EP);
G06F15/00 (KR);
G07F17/32 (EP,US);
G07F17/3223 (EP,US);
H04L41/04 (US);
H04L67/02 (EP,US);
A63F2300/407 (EP,US);
A63F2300/51 (EP,US);
H04L67/131 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SEPARABLES URL-INTERNET-SPIELSYSTEM AUF BROWSER-BASIS | [2007/28] | English: | SEPARABLE URL INTERNET BROWSER-BASED GAMING SYSTEM | [2007/28] | French: | SYSTEME DE JEU SEPARABLE BASE SUR UN NAVIGATEUR INTERNET URL | [2007/28] | Entry into regional phase | 12.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 12.04.2007 | Search fee paid | 12.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/28] | 12.02.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 03.11.2010 | CY | 03.11.2010 | CZ | 03.11.2010 | DK | 03.11.2010 | EE | 03.11.2010 | FI | 03.11.2010 | HU | 03.11.2010 | IT | 03.11.2010 | LT | 03.11.2010 | LV | 03.11.2010 | NL | 03.11.2010 | PL | 03.11.2010 | RO | 03.11.2010 | SE | 03.11.2010 | SI | 03.11.2010 | SK | 03.11.2010 | TR | 03.11.2010 | BG | 03.02.2011 | GR | 04.02.2011 | IS | 03.03.2011 | PT | 03.03.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | BE | 03.11.2010 | |
CY | 03.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2010 | ||
DK | 03.11.2010 | ||
EE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
IT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
PL | 03.11.2010 | ||
RO | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
SK | 03.11.2010 | ||
TR | 03.11.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2013/26] | BE | 03.11.2010 | |
CY | 03.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2010 | ||
DK | 03.11.2010 | ||
EE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
IT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
PL | 03.11.2010 | ||
RO | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
SK | 03.11.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | BE | 03.11.2010 | |
CZ | 03.11.2010 | ||
DK | 03.11.2010 | ||
EE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
IT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
PL | 03.11.2010 | ||
RO | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
SK | 03.11.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | BE | 03.11.2010 | |
CZ | 03.11.2010 | ||
DK | 03.11.2010 | ||
EE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
PL | 03.11.2010 | ||
RO | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
SK | 03.11.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | BE | 03.11.2010 | |
CZ | 03.11.2010 | ||
EE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/32] | BE | 03.11.2010 | |
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | FI | 03.11.2010 | |
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/23] | FI | 03.11.2010 | |
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | LT | 03.11.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004132532 (BROSNAN WILLIAM R [US], et al) [A] 1,10 * paragraph [0006] ** paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0014] * | International search | [A]US6110041 (WALKER JAY S [US], et al); | [A]US6306038 (GRAVES GORDON T [US], et al); | [AP]US2004242322 (MONTAGNA MICHAEL [US], et al) |