EP1778999 - CLUTCH, IN PARTICULAR FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE PROVIDED WITH AN IMPROVED MEMBER FOR CONNECTING TO A DRIVE MEMBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.04.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 13.11.2013 [2013/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valeo Embrayages 81 avenue Roger Dumoulin 80009 Amiens Cedex 2 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/23] | For all designated states Valeo Embrayages 5, Avenue Roger Dumoulin 80009 Amiens Cedex 1 / FR | ||
Former [2007/18] | For all designated states VALEO EMBRAYAGES 5, Avenue Roger Dumoulin 80009 Amiens Cedex 1 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TERMENON, Norberto 2 rue Turpin F-80000 AMIENS / FR | [2007/18] | Representative(s) | Benoit, Monique, et al Valeo Management Services 43, rue Bayen 75017 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/19] | Benoit, Monique, et al Valeo Management Services 43, rue Bayen 75017 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2010/23] | Lemaire, Marc, et al Valeo Transmissions Service Propriété Industrielle 14 Avenue des Béguines Immeuble Le Delta BP 68532 Cergy 95892 Cergy Pontoise Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2009/19] | Lemaire, Marc, et al Valeo Transmissions Service Propriété Industrielle 34, rue Saint-André 93012 Bobigny Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2008/31] | Doressamy, Clarisse Valeo Transmissions Service Propriété Industrielle 34, rue Saint André 93012 Bobigny / FR | Application number, filing date | 05795000.8 | 27.07.2005 | [2007/18] | WO2005FR50624 | Priority number, date | FR20040051682 | 28.07.2004 Original published format: FR 0451682 | [2007/18] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006018583 | Date: | 23.02.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1778999 | Date: | 02.05.2007 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1778999 | Date: | 09.06.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F16F15/131 | [2007/18] | CPC: |
F16F15/13107 (EP);
F16D3/79 (EP);
F16F15/1315 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KUPPLUNG, INSBESONDERE FÜR EIN KRAFTFAHRZEUG, WELCHES MIT EINEM VERBESSERTEN ELEMENT ZUR VERBINDUNG MIT EINEM ANTRIEBSELEMENT AUSGESTATTET IST | [2007/18] | English: | CLUTCH, IN PARTICULAR FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE PROVIDED WITH AN IMPROVED MEMBER FOR CONNECTING TO A DRIVE MEMBER | [2007/18] | French: | EMBRAYAGE, NOTAMMENT POUR VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE, COMPORTANT UN ORGANE PERFECTIONNE DE LIAISON A UN ORGANE MENANT | [2007/18] | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2007 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/18] | 21.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.04.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 09.04.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.06.2010 | CY | 09.06.2010 | CZ | 09.06.2010 | DK | 09.06.2010 | EE | 09.06.2010 | FI | 09.06.2010 | IE | 09.06.2010 | IT | 09.06.2010 | LT | 09.06.2010 | LV | 09.06.2010 | NL | 09.06.2010 | PL | 09.06.2010 | RO | 09.06.2010 | SE | 09.06.2010 | SI | 09.06.2010 | SK | 09.06.2010 | TR | 09.06.2010 | LU | 27.07.2010 | BE | 31.07.2010 | CH | 31.07.2010 | LI | 31.07.2010 | MC | 31.07.2010 | BG | 09.09.2010 | GB | 09.09.2010 | GR | 10.09.2010 | ES | 20.09.2010 | IS | 09.10.2010 | PT | 11.10.2010 | [2013/46] |
Former [2013/42] | AT | 09.06.2010 | |
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2010 | ||
DK | 09.06.2010 | ||
EE | 09.06.2010 | ||
FI | 09.06.2010 | ||
IE | 09.06.2010 | ||
IT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LV | 09.06.2010 | ||
NL | 09.06.2010 | ||
PL | 09.06.2010 | ||
RO | 09.06.2010 | ||
SE | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
SK | 09.06.2010 | ||
TR | 09.06.2010 | ||
LU | 27.07.2010 | ||
BE | 31.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
BG | 09.09.2010 | ||
GB | 09.09.2010 | ||
GR | 10.09.2010 | ||
IS | 09.10.2010 | ||
PT | 11.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 09.06.2010 | |
BG | 09.06.2010 | ||
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2010 | ||
DK | 09.06.2010 | ||
EE | 09.06.2010 | ||
FI | 09.06.2010 | ||
IE | 09.06.2010 | ||
IT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LV | 09.06.2010 | ||
NL | 09.06.2010 | ||
PL | 09.06.2010 | ||
RO | 09.06.2010 | ||
SE | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
SK | 09.06.2010 | ||
TR | 09.06.2010 | ||
LU | 27.07.2010 | ||
BE | 31.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
GB | 09.09.2010 | ||
GR | 10.09.2010 | ||
IS | 09.10.2010 | ||
PT | 11.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/44] | AT | 09.06.2010 | |
BG | 09.06.2010 | ||
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2010 | ||
DK | 09.06.2010 | ||
EE | 09.06.2010 | ||
FI | 09.06.2010 | ||
IE | 09.06.2010 | ||
IT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LV | 09.06.2010 | ||
NL | 09.06.2010 | ||
PL | 09.06.2010 | ||
RO | 09.06.2010 | ||
SE | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
SK | 09.06.2010 | ||
LU | 27.07.2010 | ||
BE | 31.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
GB | 09.09.2010 | ||
GR | 10.09.2010 | ||
IS | 09.10.2010 | ||
PT | 11.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 09.06.2010 | |
BG | 09.06.2010 | ||
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2010 | ||
DK | 09.06.2010 | ||
EE | 09.06.2010 | ||
FI | 09.06.2010 | ||
IE | 09.06.2010 | ||
IT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LV | 09.06.2010 | ||
NL | 09.06.2010 | ||
PL | 09.06.2010 | ||
RO | 09.06.2010 | ||
SE | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
SK | 09.06.2010 | ||
BE | 31.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
GB | 09.09.2010 | ||
GR | 10.09.2010 | ||
IS | 09.10.2010 | ||
PT | 11.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/43] | AT | 09.06.2010 | |
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2010 | ||
DK | 09.06.2010 | ||
EE | 09.06.2010 | ||
FI | 09.06.2010 | ||
IE | 09.06.2010 | ||
IT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LV | 09.06.2010 | ||
NL | 09.06.2010 | ||
PL | 09.06.2010 | ||
RO | 09.06.2010 | ||
SE | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
SK | 09.06.2010 | ||
BE | 31.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
GB | 09.09.2010 | ||
GR | 10.09.2010 | ||
IS | 09.10.2010 | ||
PT | 11.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/32] | AT | 09.06.2010 | |
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2010 | ||
DK | 09.06.2010 | ||
EE | 09.06.2010 | ||
FI | 09.06.2010 | ||
IE | 09.06.2010 | ||
IT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LV | 09.06.2010 | ||
NL | 09.06.2010 | ||
PL | 09.06.2010 | ||
RO | 09.06.2010 | ||
SE | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
SK | 09.06.2010 | ||
BE | 31.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
GR | 10.09.2010 | ||
IS | 09.10.2010 | ||
PT | 11.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 09.06.2010 | |
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2010 | ||
DK | 09.06.2010 | ||
EE | 09.06.2010 | ||
FI | 09.06.2010 | ||
IE | 09.06.2010 | ||
IT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LV | 09.06.2010 | ||
NL | 09.06.2010 | ||
PL | 09.06.2010 | ||
RO | 09.06.2010 | ||
SE | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
SK | 09.06.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
GR | 10.09.2010 | ||
IS | 09.10.2010 | ||
PT | 11.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 09.06.2010 | |
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2010 | ||
DK | 09.06.2010 | ||
EE | 09.06.2010 | ||
FI | 09.06.2010 | ||
IE | 09.06.2010 | ||
IT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LV | 09.06.2010 | ||
NL | 09.06.2010 | ||
PL | 09.06.2010 | ||
RO | 09.06.2010 | ||
SE | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
SK | 09.06.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
GR | 10.09.2010 | ||
IS | 09.10.2010 | ||
PT | 11.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/16] | AT | 09.06.2010 | |
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2010 | ||
EE | 09.06.2010 | ||
FI | 09.06.2010 | ||
IE | 09.06.2010 | ||
IT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LV | 09.06.2010 | ||
NL | 09.06.2010 | ||
PL | 09.06.2010 | ||
RO | 09.06.2010 | ||
SE | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
SK | 09.06.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
GR | 10.09.2010 | ||
IS | 09.10.2010 | ||
PT | 11.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | AT | 09.06.2010 | |
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2010 | ||
EE | 09.06.2010 | ||
FI | 09.06.2010 | ||
IE | 09.06.2010 | ||
LT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LV | 09.06.2010 | ||
NL | 09.06.2010 | ||
PL | 09.06.2010 | ||
RO | 09.06.2010 | ||
SE | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
SK | 09.06.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
GR | 10.09.2010 | ||
IS | 09.10.2010 | ||
PT | 11.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/12] | AT | 09.06.2010 | |
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2010 | ||
EE | 09.06.2010 | ||
FI | 09.06.2010 | ||
IE | 09.06.2010 | ||
LT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LV | 09.06.2010 | ||
NL | 09.06.2010 | ||
PL | 09.06.2010 | ||
RO | 09.06.2010 | ||
SE | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
SK | 09.06.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
GR | 10.09.2010 | ||
PT | 11.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 09.06.2010 | |
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
EE | 09.06.2010 | ||
FI | 09.06.2010 | ||
IE | 09.06.2010 | ||
LT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LV | 09.06.2010 | ||
NL | 09.06.2010 | ||
PL | 09.06.2010 | ||
SE | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
GR | 10.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 09.06.2010 | |
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
FI | 09.06.2010 | ||
IE | 09.06.2010 | ||
LT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LV | 09.06.2010 | ||
NL | 09.06.2010 | ||
PL | 09.06.2010 | ||
SE | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
GR | 10.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/05] | AT | 09.06.2010 | |
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
FI | 09.06.2010 | ||
LT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LV | 09.06.2010 | ||
PL | 09.06.2010 | ||
SE | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
GR | 10.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/04] | AT | 09.06.2010 | |
FI | 09.06.2010 | ||
LT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LV | 09.06.2010 | ||
PL | 09.06.2010 | ||
SE | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
GR | 10.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/02] | AT | 09.06.2010 | |
FI | 09.06.2010 | ||
LT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LV | 09.06.2010 | ||
SE | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
GR | 10.09.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR1021778 (HYDRAULIC COUPLING PATENTS LTD); | [X]US5323665 (REDIKER JR FRANK J [US]) [X] 15 * figure 4 *; | [A]EP0803661 (FUJI KIKO KK [JP]) [A] 1 * figures 7-9 * * claim 1 * * column 10, line 43 - column 12, line 42 *; | [A]DE19840217 (DAIHATSU MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 * * claim 1 * | by applicant | FR2830585 |