EP1805248 - METHOD FOR DISSOLVING PPTA IN SULFURIC ACID USING A TWIN SCREW EXTRUDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.01.2009 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.12.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 12.01.2011 [2011/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Teijin Aramid B.V. Westervoortsedijk 73 6827 AV Arnhem / NL | [2007/52] |
Former [2007/28] | For all designated states Teijin Twaron B.V. Westervoortsedijk 73 6827 AV Arnhem / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOENDERS, Bernardus, Maria St. Dominicuslaan 22 NL-6931 GG Westervoort / NL | [2007/28] | Representative(s) | Heimann, Anette CPW GmbH Kasinostrasse 19-21 42103 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/28] | Heimann, Anette CPW GmbH Patentabteilung Kasinostrasse 19-21 42103 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 05795028.9 | 20.10.2005 | [2007/28] | WO2005EP11262 | Priority number, date | EP20040025141 | 22.10.2004 Original published format: EP 04025141 | [2007/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006045517 | Date: | 04.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1805248 | Date: | 11.07.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1805248 | Date: | 05.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C08J3/00, C08J3/02, C08L77/06 | [2007/28] | CPC: |
C08J3/05 (EP,US);
C08J3/00 (KR);
B29C48/40 (EP,US);
B29C48/585 (EP,US);
B29C48/59 (EP,US);
C08J3/02 (KR);
C08L77/06 (KR);
D01D1/02 (EP,US);
D01F6/805 (EP,US);
B82Y30/00 (KR);
C08J2377/10 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1369 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR AUFLÖSUNG VON PPTA IN SCHWEFELSÄURE UNTER VERWENDUNG EINES DOPPELSCHNECKENEXTRUDERS | [2007/28] | English: | METHOD FOR DISSOLVING PPTA IN SULFURIC ACID USING A TWIN SCREW EXTRUDER | [2007/28] | French: | PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE DISSOUDRE DU PPTA DANS DE L'ACIDE SULFURIQUE A L'AIDE D'UNE EXTRUDEUSE A DEUX VIS | [2007/28] | Entry into regional phase | 22.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 22.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/28] | 04.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.03.2008 | BE | 05.03.2008 | CY | 05.03.2008 | CZ | 05.03.2008 | DK | 05.03.2008 | EE | 05.03.2008 | FI | 05.03.2008 | LT | 05.03.2008 | LV | 05.03.2008 | PL | 05.03.2008 | RO | 05.03.2008 | SI | 05.03.2008 | SK | 05.03.2008 | TR | 05.03.2008 | BG | 05.06.2008 | SE | 05.06.2008 | GR | 06.06.2008 | IS | 05.07.2008 | PT | 05.08.2008 | HU | 06.09.2008 | LU | 20.10.2008 | MC | 31.10.2008 | [2011/02] |
Former [2010/40] | AT | 05.03.2008 | |
BE | 05.03.2008 | ||
CY | 05.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2008 | ||
DK | 05.03.2008 | ||
EE | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
LT | 05.03.2008 | ||
LV | 05.03.2008 | ||
PL | 05.03.2008 | ||
RO | 05.03.2008 | ||
SI | 05.03.2008 | ||
SK | 05.03.2008 | ||
TR | 05.03.2008 | ||
BG | 05.06.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
IS | 05.07.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
HU | 06.09.2008 | ||
LU | 20.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 05.03.2008 | |
BE | 05.03.2008 | ||
CY | 05.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2008 | ||
DK | 05.03.2008 | ||
EE | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
LT | 05.03.2008 | ||
LV | 05.03.2008 | ||
PL | 05.03.2008 | ||
RO | 05.03.2008 | ||
SI | 05.03.2008 | ||
SK | 05.03.2008 | ||
BG | 05.06.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
IS | 05.07.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
LU | 20.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2010/01] | AT | 05.03.2008 | |
BE | 05.03.2008 | ||
CY | 05.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2008 | ||
DK | 05.03.2008 | ||
EE | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
LT | 05.03.2008 | ||
LV | 05.03.2008 | ||
PL | 05.03.2008 | ||
RO | 05.03.2008 | ||
SI | 05.03.2008 | ||
SK | 05.03.2008 | ||
BG | 05.06.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
IS | 05.07.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/28] | AT | 05.03.2008 | |
BE | 05.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2008 | ||
DK | 05.03.2008 | ||
EE | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
LT | 05.03.2008 | ||
LV | 05.03.2008 | ||
PL | 05.03.2008 | ||
RO | 05.03.2008 | ||
SI | 05.03.2008 | ||
SK | 05.03.2008 | ||
BG | 05.06.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
IS | 05.07.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 05.03.2008 | |
BE | 05.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2008 | ||
DK | 05.03.2008 | ||
EE | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
LT | 05.03.2008 | ||
LV | 05.03.2008 | ||
PL | 05.03.2008 | ||
RO | 05.03.2008 | ||
SI | 05.03.2008 | ||
SK | 05.03.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
IS | 05.07.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 05.03.2008 | |
BE | 05.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2008 | ||
DK | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
LT | 05.03.2008 | ||
LV | 05.03.2008 | ||
PL | 05.03.2008 | ||
RO | 05.03.2008 | ||
SI | 05.03.2008 | ||
SK | 05.03.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
IS | 05.07.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | AT | 05.03.2008 | |
BE | 05.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2008 | ||
DK | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
LV | 05.03.2008 | ||
PL | 05.03.2008 | ||
RO | 05.03.2008 | ||
SI | 05.03.2008 | ||
SK | 05.03.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
IS | 05.07.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/05] | AT | 05.03.2008 | |
BE | 05.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
LV | 05.03.2008 | ||
PL | 05.03.2008 | ||
RO | 05.03.2008 | ||
SI | 05.03.2008 | ||
SK | 05.03.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
IS | 05.07.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 05.03.2008 | |
BE | 05.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
LV | 05.03.2008 | ||
PL | 05.03.2008 | ||
RO | 05.03.2008 | ||
SI | 05.03.2008 | ||
SK | 05.03.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 05.03.2008 | |
BE | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
LV | 05.03.2008 | ||
PL | 05.03.2008 | ||
SI | 05.03.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | AT | 05.03.2008 | |
BE | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
LV | 05.03.2008 | ||
PL | 05.03.2008 | ||
SI | 05.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | AT | 05.03.2008 | |
BE | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
PL | 05.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 05.03.2008 | |
FI | 05.03.2008 | Cited in | International search | [AD]EP0821708 (BASF AG [DE]) [AD] 1-9* the whole document *; | [A]EP1435407 (TEIJIN TWARON BV [NL]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document * |