EP1812023 - LACTIC ACID BACTERIA AS PROBIOTIC STRAINS AND COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2017 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 06.12.2017 [2017/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Graf, Federico, Dr. Sempacherstrasse 19 8032 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2007/39] | For all designated states Graf, Frederico, Dr. Sempacherstrasse 19 8032 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2007/31] | For all designated states Bdn Bio Sarl Route de la Plaine 5 CH-1022 Chavannes/Renens / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRAF, Federico c/o Medinova AG Eggbühlstrasse 14 CH-8050 Zürich / CH | 02 /
GROB, Philipp c/o Medinova AG Eggbühlstrasse 14 CH-8050 Zürich / CH | 03 /
BRASSART, Dominique BDN Bio S.a.r.l. Route de la Plaine 5 CH-1022 Chavannes/Renens / CH | [2012/31] |
Former [2007/31] | 01 /
GRAF, Federico c/o Medinova AG Eggbühlstrasse 14 CH-8050 Zürich / CH | ||
02 /
GROB, Philipp c/o Medinova AG Eggbühlstrasse 14 CH-8050 Zürich / CH | |||
03 /
BRASSART, Dominique BDN Bio S.a.r.l. Route de la Plaine 5 CH-1022 Chavannes/Renens / CH | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/31] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/31] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/29] | Becker Kurig Straus Patentanwälte Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/31] | Becker Kurig Straus Patentanwälte Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05795238.4 | 17.10.2005 | [2007/31] | WO2005EP11152 | Priority number, date | WO2004EP11980 | 22.10.2004 Original published format: PCT/EP2004/011980 | WO2004EP11981 | 22.10.2004 Original published format: PCT/EP2004/011981 | WO2005EP01354 | 10.02.2005 Original published format: PCT/EP2005/001354 | [2007/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006045475 | Date: | 04.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1812023 | Date: | 01.08.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1812023 | Date: | 01.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/31] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1812023 | Date: | 26.12.2012 | [2012/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/74, A61P31/00 | [2007/31] | CPC: |
A61K35/747 (EP,US);
A23L2/382 (EP,US);
A23L33/135 (EP,US);
A61K9/0034 (US);
A61K9/0053 (US);
A61K9/02 (EP,US);
A61K9/48 (US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P13/00 (EP);
A61P13/02 (EP);
A61P13/10 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P15/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/10 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
C12N1/205 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00 (EP,US);
A61K2035/115 (US);
C12R2001/225 (EP,US);
C12R2001/23 (EP,US);
Y02A50/30 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K35/747, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/32, A23V2200/3204 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/31] | Title | German: | MILCHSÄURE-BAKTERIEN ALS PROBIOTISCHE STÄMME UND DIESE ENTHALTENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2007/31] | English: | LACTIC ACID BACTERIA AS PROBIOTIC STRAINS AND COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING SAME | [2007/31] | French: | BACTERIES LACTIQUES UTILISEES COMME SOUCHES PROBIOTIQUES ET COMPOSITIONS LES CONTENANT | [2007/31] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 11.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 11.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.08.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/31] | 14.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 17.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP12178634.7 / EP2561880 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.12.2010 | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 01.08.2012 | CY | 01.08.2012 | CZ | 01.08.2012 | DK | 01.08.2012 | EE | 01.08.2012 | LT | 01.08.2012 | LV | 01.08.2012 | RO | 01.08.2012 | SI | 01.08.2012 | SK | 01.08.2012 | IE | 17.10.2012 | MC | 31.10.2012 | BG | 01.11.2012 | GR | 02.11.2012 | IS | 01.12.2012 | PT | 03.12.2012 | [2017/49] |
Former [2017/43] | BE | 01.08.2012 | |
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2012 | ||
DK | 01.08.2012 | ||
EE | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
RO | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
SK | 01.08.2012 | ||
IE | 17.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 01.11.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | BE | 01.08.2012 | |
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2012 | ||
DK | 01.08.2012 | ||
EE | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
RO | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
SK | 01.08.2012 | ||
IE | 17.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 01.11.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | BE | 01.08.2012 | |
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2012 | ||
DK | 01.08.2012 | ||
EE | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
RO | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
SK | 01.08.2012 | ||
IE | 17.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/24] | BE | 01.08.2012 | |
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2012 | ||
DK | 01.08.2012 | ||
EE | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
RO | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
SK | 01.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | BE | 01.08.2012 | |
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2012 | ||
DK | 01.08.2012 | ||
EE | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
RO | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
SK | 01.08.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | BE | 01.08.2012 | |
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2012 | ||
DK | 01.08.2012 | ||
EE | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | BE | 01.08.2012 | |
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
DK | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | BE | 01.08.2012 | |
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | BE | 01.08.2012 | |
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 01.08.2012 | |
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 01.08.2012 | |
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | LT | 01.08.2012 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9009398 (BIOINVENT INT AB [SE]) [Y] 1-21* page 9 - page 12; claims 1-9 *; | [X]US5645830 (REID GREGOR [CA], et al) [X] 1-21 * column 3 - column 4 *; | [X]EP0956858 (CAVALIERE VESELY RENATA MARIA [IT], et al) [X] 1-21 * page 3 - page 4; claims 1-12; table 1 *; | [X]US6093394 (CHRISOPE GERALD L [US]) [X] 1-21 * column 2 - column 6 * * column 22 *; | [X]WO03080813 (BIFODAN AS [DK], et al) [X] 1-21 * page 5 - page 6 * * page 11 - page 16; claims 1-42 *; | [Y] - BORIS S ET AL, "Adherence of human vaginal lactobacilli to vaginal epithelial cells and interaction with uropathogens", INFECTION AND IMMUNITY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY. WASHINGTON, US, (199805), vol. 66, no. 5, ISSN 0019-9567, pages 1985 - 1989, XP002958494 [Y] 1-21 * page 11 - page 12 * | [Y] - OCANA V ET AL, "ADHESION OF LACTOBACILLUS VAGINAL STRAINS WITH PROBIOTIC PROPERTIES TO VAGINAL EPITHELIAL CELLS", BIOCELL, INSTITUTO DE HISTOLOGIA EMBRIOLOGIA, FACULTAD DE CIENCIAS,, AR, (2001), vol. 25, no. 3, ISSN 0327-9545, pages 265 - 273, XP001115002 [Y] 1-21 * page 266 * * page 272 * | [Y] - TODORIKI K ET AL, "Inhibition of adhesion of food-borne pathogens to Caco-2 cells by Lactobacillus strains", JOURNAL OF APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY, (200107), vol. 91, no. 1, ISSN 1364-5072, pages 154 - 159, XP002332588 [Y] 1-21 * page 157 - page 158 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-2672.2001.01371.x | [Y] - GRANATO, DOMINIQUE ET AL, "Cell surface-associated lipoteichoic acid acts as an adhesion factor for attachment of Lactobacillus johnsonii La1 to human enterocyte-like caco-2 cells", APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY , 65(3), 1071-1077 CODEN: AEMIDF; ISSN: 0099-2240, (1999), XP002332589 [Y] 1-21 * page 1071 * * page 1076 * | [Y] - PFEIFER A ET AL, "Immunological effect of probiotic food", MONATSSCHRIFT FUR KINDERHEILKUNDE 1998 GERMANY, (1998), vol. 146, no. 8 SUPPL. 1, ISSN 0026-9298, pages S13 - S20, XP009049233 [Y] 1-21 * page S13 - page S19 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s001120050238 | [X] - BRASSART, D., "L. acidophilus NCFM: functional properties of a unique probiotic strain", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (2003), Database accession no. 140:162498, URL: STN, XP002332655 [X] 1-21 * abstract * | [X] - HUANG CANGHAI ET AL, "Effects of Lactobacilli on the performance, diarrhea incidence, VFA concentration and gastrointestinal microbial flora of weaning pigs.", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (200403), Database accession no. PREV200400233250, XP002332656 [X] 1-21 * abstract * | [ ] - ASIAN-AUSTRALASIAN JOURNAL OF ANIMAL SCIENCES, (200403), vol. 17, no. 3, ISSN 1011-2367, pages 401 - 409 | [Y] - MICHETTI, PIERRE ET AL, "Effect of whey-based culture supernatant of Lactobacillus acidophilus (johnsonii) La1 on Helicobacter pylori infection in humans", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (1999), Database accession no. 131:17350, URL: STN, XP002332657 [Y] 1-21 * abstract * | Examination | - PERDIGON ET AL., "Interaction of lactic acid bacteria with the gut immune system.", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF CLINICAL NUTRITION, vol. 56, no. SUPPL 4, pages S21 - S26 |