EP1804890 - BODY-INSERTABLE APPARATUS FOR ASPIRATING AND EXPELLING FLUID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/28] | BODY-INSERTABLE APPARATUS FOR ASPIRATING AND EXPELLING BODY FLUID AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREOF | ||
[2010/32] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.12.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.01.2012 [2012/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | [2007/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWANO, Hironao 1-35-17-201 Sakaecho, Hino-shi Tokyo 1910001 / JP | [2011/04] |
Former [2007/28] | 01 /
KAWANO, Hironao 1-35-17-201 Sakacheo, Hino-shi Tokyo 1910001 / JP | Representative(s) | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/28] | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05795322.6 | 14.10.2005 | [2007/28] | WO2005JP19356 | Priority number, date | JP20040302149 | 15.10.2004 Original published format: JP 2004302149 | [2007/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006041222 | Date: | 20.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/16] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1804890 | Date: | 11.07.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1804890 | Date: | 26.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61M31/00, A61M37/00, A61M5/142, F04B43/02 | [2007/28] | CPC: |
A61M31/002 (EP,US);
A61M31/00 (KR);
A61B10/00 (KR);
A61M37/00 (EP,KR,US);
A61M5/142 (KR);
A61M5/14276 (EP,US);
F04B43/02 (EP,US);
A61M2205/0266 (EP,US);
A61M5/14586 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/04] |
Former [2007/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IN DEN KÖRPER EINFÜHRBARES GERÄT ZUM ASPIRIEREN UND ABGEBEN VON FLÜSSIGKEIT | [2010/32] | English: | BODY-INSERTABLE APPARATUS FOR ASPIRATING AND EXPELLING FLUID | [2010/32] | French: | DISPOSITIF INSERABLE DANS LE CORPS POUR ASPIRER ET EXPULSER DES LIQUIDES | [2010/32] |
Former [2007/28] | IN DEN KÖRPER EINFÜHRBARES GERÄT ZUM ASPIRIEREN UND AUSDRÜCKEN VON KÖRPERFLÜSSIGKEIT UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | ||
Former [2007/28] | BODY-INSERTABLE APPARATUS FOR ASPIRATING AND EXPELLING BODY FLUID AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREOF | ||
Former [2007/28] | DISPOSITIF INSERABLE DANS LE CORPS ET METHODE DE FABRICATION | Entry into regional phase | 12.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 12.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/28] | 27.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.10.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2004068224 (COUVILLON LUCIEN ALFRED [US], et al) [X] 1-21 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0059]; figures 3,5a-6 *; | [A]US4439197 (HONDA MIKIO [JP], et al) [A] 1-21 * abstract *; | [A]WO9937921 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US]); | [A]US3485235 (FELSON RONALD) | by applicant | JPH0236848 | US2004068224 |