EP1829992 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING SINGLE CRYSTAL AND A METHOD FOR PRODUCING ANNEALED WAFER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/36] | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING SINGLE CRYSTAL AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING ANNEALED WAFER | ||
[2013/26] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.05.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.06.2014 [2014/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Handotai Co., Ltd. 6-2, Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [2008/14] |
Former [2007/36] | For all designated states SHIN-ETSU HANDOTAI COMPANY LIMITED 4-2, Marunouchi 1-Chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOSHI, Ryoji c/o Shin-Etsu Handotai Co., Ltd 150, Aza Ohira, Oaza Odakura Nishigo-mura Nishishirakawa-gun Fukushima / JP | 02 /
YANAGIMACHI T. c/o Shin-Etsu Handotai Co., Ltd 150, Aza Ohira, Oaza Odakura Nishigo-mura Nishishirakawa-gun Fukushima / JP | [2007/36] | Representative(s) | Wibbelmann, Jobst Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/26] | Wibbelmann, Jobst Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/36] | Wibbelmann, Jobst Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05795662.5 | 21.10.2005 | [2007/36] | WO2005JP19385 | Priority number, date | JP20040363916 | 16.12.2004 Original published format: JP 2004363916 | [2007/36] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006064610 | Date: | 22.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1829992 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1829992 | Date: | 26.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.06.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C30B15/20, C30B29/06, C30B33/02 | [2007/36] | CPC: |
C30B15/203 (EP,US);
C30B15/20 (KR);
C30B15/14 (EP,US);
C30B29/06 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2008/08] |
Former [2007/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES EINKRISTALLS UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES GETEMPERTEN WAFERS | [2007/36] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING SINGLE CRYSTAL AND A METHOD FOR PRODUCING ANNEALED WAFER | [2013/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN MONOCRISTAL ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE PLAQUETTE RECUITE | [2007/36] |
Former [2007/36] | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING SINGLE CRYSTAL AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING ANNEALED WAFER | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2007 | Translation filed | 13.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.2007 | Search fee paid | 13.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/36] | 24.08.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 25.10.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.04.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.04.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 15.04.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.07.2011 | Opposition(s) | 27.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0942078 (SHINETSU HANDOTAI KK [JP]) [Y] 4-6 * paragraphs [0107] , [0109] , [0110]; figure 3; table 1 *; | [IY]JP2001342097 (KOMATSU DENSHI KINZOKU KK) [I] 1-3 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] , [0012] , [0019] , [0020] , [0022] , [0023] , [0035] , [0049] , [0050] , [0061] - [0064] * [Y] 4-6; | [Y]JP2004134439 (SHINETSU HANDOTAI KK) [Y] 5-6 * paragraph [0112] *; | EP1551058 [ ] (SHINETSU HANDOTAI KK [JP]) | International search | [X]JP2000178099 (SHINETSU HANDOTAI KK); | [X]JP2001342097 (KOMATSU DENSHI KINZOKU KK); | [A]WO0214587 (SHINETSU HANDOTAI KK [JP], et al); | [A]JP2003040694 (SUMITOMO MITSUBISHI SILICON); | [Y]JP2004134439 (SHINETSU HANDOTAI KK) | Examination | WO2004040650 | EP1557883 |