EP1826313 - FABRIC FOR RESTRAINT DEVICE AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.10.2012 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.11.2012 [2012/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TORAY INDUSTRIES, INC. 1-1, Nihonbashi-Muromachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8666 / JP | [2007/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOKOI, Daisuke 10-A3-14, Sonoyama 2-chome, Otsu-shi, Shiga 5200842 / JP | 02 /
MORIMOTO, Atsushi Am Hohen Weg 14 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 03 /
TSUCHIZAKI, Toru 4-19, Asahidai 3-chome, Ishioka-shi, Ibaraki 3150038 / JP | 04 /
SHIOTANI, Takashi 6-6, Wakakusa 7-chome, Kusatsu-shi, Shiga 5250045 / JP | 05 /
MATSUMURA, Kazuya 12-15, Ohira 1-chome, Otsu-shi Shiga 520-0867 / JP | [2007/49] |
Former [2007/39] | 01 /
YOKOI, Daisuke 10-A3-14, Sonoyama 2-chome, Otsu-shi, Shiga 5200842 / JP | ||
02 /
MORIMOTO, Atsushi Am Hohen Weg 14 Frankfurt am Main / DE | |||
03 /
TSUCHIZAKI, Toru 4-19, Asahidai 3-chome, Ishioka-shi, Ibaraki 3150038 / JP | |||
04 /
SHIOTANI, Takashi 6-6, Wakakusa 7-chome, Kusatsu-shi, Shiga 5250045 / JP | |||
05 /
MATSUMURA, Kazuya 2-3-2-314, Kasuga 5-chome, Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 5670031 / JP | |||
Former [2007/36] | 01 /
YOKOI, Daisuke 10-A3-14, Sonoyama 2-chome, Otsu-shi, Shiga 5200842 / JP | ||
02 /
MORIMOTO, Atsushi 2-1-207, Mishima-cho, Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 5670022 / JP | |||
03 /
TSUCHIZAKI, Toru 4-19, Asahidai 3-chome, Ishioka-shi, Ibaraki 3150038 / JP | |||
04 /
SHIOTANI, Takashi 6-6, Wakakusa 7-chome, Kusatsu-shi, Shiga 5250045 / JP | |||
05 /
MATSUMURA, Kazuya 2-3-2-314, Kasuga 5-chome, Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 5670031 / JP | |||
Former [2007/35] | 01 /
YOKOI, Daisuke 10-A3-14, Sonoyama 2-chome, Otsu-shi, Shiga 5200842 / JP | ||
02 /
MORIMOTO, Atsushi 2-1-207, Mishima-cho, Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 5670022 / JP | |||
03 /
TSUCHIZAKI, Toru 4-19, Asahidai 3-chome, Ishioka-shi, Ibaraki 3150038 / JP | |||
04 /
SHIOTANI, Takashi 6-6, Wakakusa 7-chome, Kusatsu-shi, Shiga 5250045 / JP | |||
05 /
Matsumura, Kazuya 2-3-2-314, Kasuga 5-chome, Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 5670031 / JP | Representative(s) | Webster, Jeremy Mark, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/35] | Webster, Jeremy Mark, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 05795668.2 | 18.10.2005 | [2007/35] | WO2005JP19067 | Priority number, date | JP20040303932 | 19.10.2004 Original published format: JP 2004303932 | [2007/35] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006043517 | Date: | 27.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1826313 | Date: | 29.08.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | D06M11/00, D06M11/38, D03D15/00, B60R21/18, B60R22/28 | [2007/35] | CPC: |
D03D1/02 (EP,US);
D03D1/0005 (EP,US);
D03D15/00 (EP,US);
D03D15/283 (EP,US);
D03D15/33 (EP,US);
D03D15/41 (EP,US);
D03D15/46 (EP,US);
D03D15/513 (EP,US);
D03D15/573 (EP,US);
D06M15/643 (EP,US);
D06N3/0004 (EP,US);
D06N3/128 (EP,US);
B60R2021/23514 (EP,US);
B60R21/18 (EP,US);
D10B2321/021 (EP,US);
D10B2321/022 (EP,US);
D10B2321/06 (EP,US);
D10B2321/10 (EP,US);
D10B2331/02 (EP,US);
D10B2331/021 (EP,US);
D10B2331/04 (EP,US);
D10B2401/063 (EP,US);
D10B2505/122 (EP,US);
D10B2505/124 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TEXTILES FLÄCHENGEBILDE FÜR RÜCKHALTEVORRICHTUNG UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2007/35] | English: | FABRIC FOR RESTRAINT DEVICE AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | [2007/35] | French: | TISSU POUR DISPOSITIFS DE RETENUE ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [2007/35] | Entry into regional phase | 23.04.2007 | Translation filed | 04.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.2007 | Search fee paid | 04.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/35] | 06.08.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/45] | 12.06.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2011 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH07258940 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [Y]JPH09111587 (HOECHST TREVIRA GMBH & CO KG); | [Y]JPH11348724 (TAKATA CORP) |