EP1813973 - OPTICAL FIBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.08.2018 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.09.2018 [2018/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | [2007/36] |
Former [2007/31] | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | ||
For all designated states Showa Electric Wire and Cable Co., Ltd. 1-1 Odasakae 2-chome, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-0843 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
INOUE, Dai, Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 1-10, Hitomi, Matsuida-machi Usui-gun, Gunma 379-0224 / JP | 02 /
OYAMADA, Hiroshi, Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 1-10, Hitomi, Matsuida-machi Usui-gun, Gunma 379-0224 / JP | 03 /
MORISHITA, Yuichi, SHOWA ELEC. WIRE & CABLE CO LTD 1-1, Odasakae 2-chome Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-0843 / JP | [2007/31] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Joachimsthaler Straße 10-12 10719 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/31] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Joachimstaler Strasse 10-12 10719 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 05795856.3 | 20.10.2005 | [2007/31] | WO2005JP19314 | Priority number, date | JP20040316796 | 29.10.2004 Original published format: JP 2004316796 | JP20050048792 | 24.02.2005 Original published format: JP 2005048792 | [2007/31] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006046467 | Date: | 04.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1813973 | Date: | 01.08.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.05.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/02, G02B6/028 | [2011/34] | CPC: |
G02B6/03611 (EP,US);
G02B6/028 (KR);
G02B6/02004 (EP,US);
G02B6/02019 (EP,US);
G02B6/0281 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/31] | G02B6/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2008/06] |
Former [2007/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTISCHE FASER | [2007/31] | English: | OPTICAL FIBER | [2007/31] | French: | FIBRE OPTIQUE | [2007/31] | Entry into regional phase | 16.05.2007 | Translation filed | 16.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 16.05.2007 | Search fee paid | 16.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/31] | 16.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/39] | 24.05.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/39] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.12.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 11.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO0127667 (CORNING INC [US]) [X] 1-4 * figures 1,2; table 1 * * page 6, line 26 - line 28 * * page 9, line 24 - page 11, line 19 * [I] 5; | [A]US2004136668 (TAKAHASHI FUMIO [JP], et al) [A] 5 * paragraph [0084]; figures 4,5 ** paragraph [0092] - paragraph [0093] *; | [X]US2004146259 (KALISH DAVID [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0080] * * figure 8 * | International search | [X]JP2002533774 ; | [X]JP2003515755 ; | [Y]JP2002202428 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES) | Examination | EP0779524 | by applicant | WO0127667 |