EP1812943 - AUTOMATIC CIRCUIT BREAKER WITH TRIPPING DEVICE ACTIVATED BY A MOVABLE CONTACT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.01.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB S.p.A. Via Vittor Pisani 16 20124 Milano / IT | [2008/14] |
Former [2007/31] | For all designated states ABB Service S.r.l Via Vittor Pisani 16 20124 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BONETTI, Luigi Via San Bernardino 93/A I-24126 Bergamo / IT | 02 /
BRESCIANI, Nicola Via Giacomo Puccini, 32 I-24129 Bergamo / IT | [2007/31] | Representative(s) | Giavarini, Francesco, et al Zanoli & Giavarini S.p.A. Via Melchiorre Gioia, 64 20125 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2007/31] | Giavarini, Francesco, et al Zanoli & Giavarini S.r.l. Via Melchiorre Gioia, 64 20125 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 05796003.1 | 18.10.2005 | [2007/31] | WO2005EP11250 | Priority number, date | IT2004MI02234 | 19.11.2004 Original published format: IT MI20042234 | [2007/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006053619 | Date: | 26.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1812943 | Date: | 01.08.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1812943 | Date: | 27.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01H71/43, H01H77/10 | [2007/31] | CPC: |
H01H77/10 (EP,US);
H01H71/43 (EP,US);
H01H1/2041 (EP,US);
H01H2003/323 (EP,US);
H01H2071/2427 (EP,US);
H01H71/525 (EP,US);
H01H71/74 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/31] | Title | German: | SELBSTSCHALTER MIT DURCH BEWEGTKONTAKT AKTIVIERTE AUSLÖSEVORRICHTUNG | [2012/45] | English: | AUTOMATIC CIRCUIT BREAKER WITH TRIPPING DEVICE ACTIVATED BY A MOVABLE CONTACT | [2007/31] | French: | DISJONCTEUR AUTOMATIQUE COMPRENANT UN DECLENCHEUR ACTIVE PAR UN CONTACT MOBILE | [2007/31] |
Former [2007/31] | AUTOMATISCHER UNTERBRECHERSCHALTER MIT EINER DURCH EINEN BEWEGLICHEN KONTAKT AKTIVIERTEN AUSLÖSEEINRICHTUNG | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/31] | 24.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 14.01.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.07.2009 | Opposition(s) | 28.11.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.10.2005 | AT | 27.02.2013 | BE | 27.02.2013 | CY | 27.02.2013 | CZ | 27.02.2013 | DK | 27.02.2013 | EE | 27.02.2013 | FI | 27.02.2013 | LT | 27.02.2013 | LV | 27.02.2013 | MC | 27.02.2013 | NL | 27.02.2013 | PL | 27.02.2013 | RO | 27.02.2013 | SI | 27.02.2013 | SK | 27.02.2013 | BG | 27.05.2013 | IS | 27.06.2013 | PT | 27.06.2013 | IE | 18.10.2013 | LU | 18.10.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2014/48] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
BE | 27.02.2013 | ||
CY | 27.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2013 | ||
DK | 27.02.2013 | ||
EE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
MC | 27.02.2013 | ||
NL | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
RO | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
SK | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
IE | 18.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
BE | 27.02.2013 | ||
CY | 27.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2013 | ||
DK | 27.02.2013 | ||
EE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
MC | 27.02.2013 | ||
NL | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
RO | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
SK | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
BE | 27.02.2013 | ||
CY | 27.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2013 | ||
DK | 27.02.2013 | ||
EE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
NL | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
RO | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
SK | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
BE | 27.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2013 | ||
DK | 27.02.2013 | ||
EE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
NL | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
RO | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
SK | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
BE | 27.02.2013 | ||
DK | 27.02.2013 | ||
EE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
NL | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
BE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
BE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 27.02.2013 | |
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 27.02.2013 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE29511457U (KLOECKNER MOELLER GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-5,10-15 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1026719 (AEG NIEDERSPANNUNGSTECH GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-5,10-15 * the whole document *; | [X]DE1463311 (LICENTIA GMBH) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]US4153828 (BARKAN PHILIP) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]US3646488 (IIDA MASACHIKA, et al) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0419276 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP [US]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US3272953 (TILLSON ROBERT S) [A] 6 * the whole document * |