EP1792079 - POSITIONING OR ACTUATING MEMBER MADE OF A STRUCTURED SHAPE MEMORY ALLOY MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.2011 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Palladio Systeme GmbH Giesserweg 1 38855 Wernigerode / DE | [2007/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIMONS, Oliver Adelheidring 17 39108 Magdeburg / DE | [2007/23] | Representative(s) | Kruspig, Volkmar Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 47 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/23] | Kruspig, Volkmar Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Widenmayerstrasse 48 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05796272.2 | 16.09.2005 | [2007/23] | WO2005EP10010 | Priority number, date | DE20041044979 | 16.09.2004 Original published format: DE102004044979 | DE20041059188 | 08.12.2004 Original published format: DE102004059188 | [2007/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006029892 | Date: | 23.03.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/12] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1792079 | Date: | 06.06.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1792079 | Date: | 14.04.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F03G7/06 | [2007/23] | CPC: |
F03G7/065 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STELL-ODER BETÄTIGUNGSGLIED AUS EINEM STRUKTURIERTEN FORMGEDÄCHTNIS-LEGIERUNGSMATERIAL | [2007/23] | English: | POSITIONING OR ACTUATING MEMBER MADE OF A STRUCTURED SHAPE MEMORY ALLOY MATERIAL | [2007/23] | French: | ORGANE DE REGLAGE OU D'ACTIONNEMENT CONSTITUE D'UN ALLIAGE A MEMOIRE DE FORME STRUCTURE | [2007/23] | Entry into regional phase | 11.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 11.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/23] | 26.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 14.04.2010 | DK | 14.04.2010 | EE | 14.04.2010 | FI | 14.04.2010 | IE | 14.04.2010 | LT | 14.04.2010 | LV | 14.04.2010 | NL | 14.04.2010 | PL | 14.04.2010 | RO | 14.04.2010 | SE | 14.04.2010 | SI | 14.04.2010 | SK | 14.04.2010 | TR | 14.04.2010 | CY | 12.05.2010 | BG | 14.07.2010 | GR | 15.07.2010 | ES | 25.07.2010 | IS | 14.08.2010 | PT | 16.08.2010 | AT | 16.09.2010 | GB | 16.09.2010 | LU | 16.09.2010 | BE | 30.09.2010 | CH | 30.09.2010 | LI | 30.09.2010 | MC | 30.09.2010 | HU | 15.10.2010 | [2013/42] |
Former [2012/47] | BG | 14.04.2010 | |
CZ | 14.04.2010 | ||
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
IE | 14.04.2010 | ||
LT | 14.04.2010 | ||
LV | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
PL | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
TR | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 12.05.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
IS | 14.08.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
AT | 16.09.2010 | ||
GB | 16.09.2010 | ||
LU | 16.09.2010 | ||
BE | 30.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
HU | 15.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/44] | BG | 14.04.2010 | |
CZ | 14.04.2010 | ||
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
IE | 14.04.2010 | ||
LT | 14.04.2010 | ||
LV | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
PL | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 12.05.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
IS | 14.08.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
AT | 16.09.2010 | ||
GB | 16.09.2010 | ||
LU | 16.09.2010 | ||
BE | 30.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
HU | 15.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | BG | 14.04.2010 | |
CZ | 14.04.2010 | ||
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
IE | 14.04.2010 | ||
LT | 14.04.2010 | ||
LV | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
PL | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 12.05.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
IS | 14.08.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
AT | 16.09.2010 | ||
GB | 16.09.2010 | ||
BE | 30.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
HU | 15.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BG | 14.04.2010 | |
CZ | 14.04.2010 | ||
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
IE | 14.04.2010 | ||
LT | 14.04.2010 | ||
LV | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
PL | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 12.05.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
IS | 14.08.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
AT | 16.09.2010 | ||
GB | 16.09.2010 | ||
BE | 30.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2012/01] | CZ | 14.04.2010 | |
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
IE | 14.04.2010 | ||
LT | 14.04.2010 | ||
LV | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
PL | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 12.05.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
IS | 14.08.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
AT | 16.09.2010 | ||
GB | 16.09.2010 | ||
BE | 30.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/43] | CZ | 14.04.2010 | |
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
IE | 14.04.2010 | ||
LT | 14.04.2010 | ||
LV | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
PL | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 12.05.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
IS | 14.08.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
GB | 16.09.2010 | ||
BE | 30.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/35] | CZ | 14.04.2010 | |
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
IE | 14.04.2010 | ||
LT | 14.04.2010 | ||
LV | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
PL | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 12.05.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
IS | 14.08.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
BE | 30.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | CZ | 14.04.2010 | |
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
IE | 14.04.2010 | ||
LT | 14.04.2010 | ||
LV | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
PL | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 12.05.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
IS | 14.08.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/12] | CZ | 14.04.2010 | |
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
IE | 14.04.2010 | ||
LT | 14.04.2010 | ||
LV | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
PL | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 12.05.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
IS | 14.08.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | DK | 14.04.2010 | |
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
IE | 14.04.2010 | ||
LT | 14.04.2010 | ||
LV | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
PL | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 12.05.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
IS | 14.08.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | DK | 14.04.2010 | |
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
IE | 14.04.2010 | ||
LT | 14.04.2010 | ||
LV | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
PL | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 12.05.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
IS | 14.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/03] | FI | 14.04.2010 | |
LT | 14.04.2010 | ||
LV | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
PL | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 12.05.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
IS | 14.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/02] | FI | 14.04.2010 | |
LT | 14.04.2010 | ||
LV | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
IS | 14.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | NL | 14.04.2010 | |
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | NL | 14.04.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4553393 (RUOFF CARL F [US]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]DE19502370 (FELLER OTTO [DE]) [X] 1-3,15 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9636462 (UNIV MCGILL [CA]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]US2002046622 (YOSHIDA EIICHI [JP]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]DE10210954 (OELSCHLAEGER LARS [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,15 * the whole document *; | [A] - BALLANDRAS S ET AL, "Microstereophotolithography and shape memory alloy for the fabrication of miniaturized actuators", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS A, ELSEVIER SEQUOIA S.A., LAUSANNE, CH, (199707), vol. 62, no. 1-3, ISSN 0924-4247, pages 741 - 747, XP004119718 [A] 1,16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0924-4247(97)01574-4 |