EP1812003 - ORTHO- CONDENSED PYRIDINE AND PYRIMIDINE DERIVATIVES (E. G. PURINES) AS PROTEIN KINASES INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.05.2011 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.06.2011 [2011/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Astex Therapeutics Limited 436 Cambridge Science Park Milton Road, Cambridge CB4 0QA / GB | For all designated states The Institute of Cancer Research: Royal Cancer Hospital 123 Old Brompton Road London SW7 3RP / GB | For all designated states Cancer Research Technology Limited Sardinia House, Sardinia Street London WC2A 3NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/31] | For all designated states Astex Therapeutics Limited 436 Cambridge Science Park Milton Road, Cambridge CB4 0QA / GB | ||
For all designated states THE INSTITUTE OF CANCER RESEARCH: ROYAL CANCER HOSPITAL 123 Old Brompton Road London SW7 3RP / GB | |||
For all designated states Cancer Research Technology Limited Sardinia House, Sardinia Street London WC2A 3NL / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERDINI, Valerio 436 Cambridge Science Park Milton Road Cambridge CB4 0QA / GB | 02 /
BOYLE, Robert, George 436 Cambridge Science Park Milton Road Cambridge CB4 0QA / GB | 03 /
SAXTY, Gordon 436 Cambridge Science Park Milton Road Cambridge CB4 0QA / GB | 04 /
VERDONK, Marinus, Leendert 436 Cambridge Science Park Milton Road Cambridge CB4 0QA / GB | 05 /
WOODHEAD, Steven, John 436 Cambridge Science Park Milton Road Cambridge CB4 0QA / GB | 06 /
WYATT, Paul, Graham 436 Cambridge Science Park Milton Road Cambridge CB4 0QA / GB | 07 /
SORE, Hannah, Fiona 436 Cambridge Science Park Milton Road Cambridge CB4 0QA / GB | 08 /
CALDWELL, John Cancer Research UK 15 Cotswold Road Sutton SM2 5NG / GB | 09 /
COLLINS, Ian Cancer Research UK 15 Cotswold Road Sutton SM2 5NG / GB | 10 /
DA FONSECA, Tatiana, Faria Cancer Research UK 15 Cotswold Road Sutton SM2 5NG / GB | 11 /
DONALD, Alastair Cancer Research UK 15 Cotswold Road Sutton SM2 5NG / GB | [2007/31] | Representative(s) | Hutchins, Michael Richard Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/13] | Hutchins, Michael Richard Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
Former [2007/31] | Hutchins, Michael Richard M.R. Hutchins & Co, 23 Mount Sion Tunbridge Wells Kent TN1 1TZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05796842.2 | 25.10.2005 | [2007/31] | WO2005GB04115 | Priority number, date | GB20040023684 | 25.10.2004 Original published format: GB 0423684 | US20040621719P | 25.10.2004 Original published format: US 621719 P | US20050683980P | 24.05.2005 Original published format: US 683980 P | [2007/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006046023 | Date: | 04.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1812003 | Date: | 01.08.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/52, A61K31/519, C07D473/34, A61K31/437, C07D471/04, C07D487/04, C07D473/00 | [2007/31] | CPC: |
C07D471/04 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07D473/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ORTHOKONDENSIERTE PYRIDIN- UND PYRIMIDIN-DERIVATE (Z.B. PURINE) ALS PROTEINKINASE-HEMMER | [2007/31] | English: | ORTHO- CONDENSED PYRIDINE AND PYRIMIDINE DERIVATIVES (E. G. PURINES) AS PROTEIN KINASES INHIBITORS | [2007/31] | French: | DERIVES ORTHO-CONDENSES DE PYRIDINE ET PYRIMIDINE (PAR EXEMPLE PURINES) EN TANT QU'INHIBITEURS DE PROTEINES KINASES | [2007/31] | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/31] | 14.06.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/23] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.09.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB1047935 (AMERICAN CYANAMID CO) [X] 1,3 * example 5 * * page 2, line 74 - line 88 *; | [X]US6432947 (ARNAIZ DAMIAN O [US], et al) [X] 3 * column 55, line 31 - line 39 *; | [A]EP1444982 (MERCKLE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,3 * page 3, line 24 - page 4, line 51 ** claim 1, definition of R1 * | by applicant | US4666828 | US4683202 | US4801531 | US5192659 | WO9313072 | US5272057 | WO9738665 | US5882864 | WO9962518 | WO9965909 | US6162804 | US6218529 | WO0191754 | WO02057267 | US2003045536 | US2003073708 | WO03057696 | US2003139427 | WO2004043380 | EP1568699 | - HANKS, S.K., HUNTER, T., FASEB J, (1995), vol. 9, pages 576 - 596 | - KNIGHTON ET AL., SCIENCE, (1991), vol. 253, pages 407 - 414 | - HILES ET AL., CELL, (1992), vol. 70, pages 419 - 429 | - KUNZ ET AL., CELL, (1993), vol. 73, pages 585 - 596 | - GARCIA-BUSTOS ET AL., EMBO J, (1994), vol. 13, pages 2352 - 2361 | - GULDBERG ET AL., CANCER RESEARCH, (1997), vol. 57, pages 3660 - 3663 | - CAIRNS ET AL., CANCER RESEARCH, (1997), vol. 57, page 4997 | - BELLACOSA ET AL., INT. J. CANCER, (1995), vol. 64, pages 280 - 285 | - CHENG ET AL., PNAS, (1996), vol. 93, pages 3636 - 3641 | - YUAN ET AL., ONCOGENE, (2000), vol. 19, pages 2324 - 2330 | - STAAL, PNAS, (1987), vol. 84, pages 5034 - 5037 | - SUN ET AL., AM. J. PATHOL., (2001), vol. 159, pages 431 - 437 | - NAKATANI ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1999), vol. 274, pages 21528 - 21532 | - AANDAHL, E. M., AUKRUST, P., SKALHEGG, B. S., MIILLER, F., FROLAND, S. S., HANSSON, V., TASKEN, K., "Protein kinase A type I antagonist restores immune responses ofT cells from HIV-infected patients", FASEB J., (1998), vol. 12, pages 855 - 862 | - STRATAKIS, C.A., CHO-CHUNG, Y.S., "Protein Kinase A and human diseases", TRENDS ENDROCRI. METAB., (2002), vol. 13, pages 50 - 52 | - LI, Q., ZHU, G-D., CURRENT TOPICS IN MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (2002), vol. 2, pages 939 - 971 | - "Protein Kinase A and Human Disease", Annals of the New York Academy of Sciences, (2002), vol. 968 | - SEMONSKY ET AL., CZECH. CHEM. COMM., (1960), vol. 25, pages 1091 - 1099 | - NOELL ET AL., J. ORG. CHEM., (1958), vol. 23, pages 1547 - 1550 | - LETTRE ET AL., NATURWISSENSCHAFTEN, (1958), vol. 45, page 364 | - JERRY MARCH, Advanced Organic Chemistry, WILEY INTERSCIENCE, (1992), pages 131 - 133 | - Pharmaceutical Salts: Properties, Selection, and Use, HARDCOVER, (200208), page 388 | - BERGE ET AL., "Pharmaceutically Acceptable Salts", J. PHARM. SCI., (1977), vol. 66, pages 1 - 19 | - JERRY MARCH, Advanced Organic Chemistry, WILEY INTERSCIENCE | - L. W. DEADY, SYN. COMM., (1977), vol. 7, pages 509 - 514 | - CAHN, INGOLD, PRELOG, JERRY MARCH, Advanced Organic Chemistry, JOHN WILEY & SONS, (1992), pages 109 - 114 | - CAHN, INGOLD, PRELOG, ANGEW. CHEM. INT. ED. ENGL., (1966), vol. 5, pages 385 - 415 | - R. B. BEDFORD, C.S.J. CAZIN, CHEM. COMMUN., (2001), pages 1540 - 1541 | - J. MARCH, Advanced Organic Chemistry, JOHN WILEY & SONS, (1992), pages 945 - 947 | - N. MIYAURA, A. SUZUKI, CHEM. REV., (1995), vol. 95, page 2457 | - SHEEHAN ET AL., J. AMER. CHEM SOC., (1955), vol. 77, page 1067 | - SHEEHAN ET AL., J. ORG. CHEM., (1961), vol. 26, page 2525 | - CASTRO ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (1990), vol. 31, page 205 | - L. A. CARPINO, J. AMER. CHEM. SOC., (1993), vol. 115, page 4397 | - KONIG ET AL., CHEM. BER., vol. 103, no. 708, pages 2024 - 2034 | - JERRY MARCH, Advanced Organic Chemistry, JOHN WILEY & SONS, (1992), pages 1091 - 1092 | - DESS, D.B., MARTIN, J.C., J. ORG. SOC., (1983), vol. 48, page 4155 | - ORGANIC SYNTHESES, vol. 77, page 141 | - JERRY MARCH, Advanced Organic Chemistry, WILEY INTERSCIENCE, vol. 119 | - Fiesers' Reagentsfor Organic Synthesis, JOHN WILEY, vol. 1-17 | - Organic Syntheses, JOHN WILEY, vol. 1-8 | - ROSENTRETER U, HUBER U., "Optimal fraction collecting in preparative LC/MS", J COMB CHEM., (2004), vol. 6, no. 2, pages 159 - 64 | - LEISTER W, STRAUSS K, WISNOSKI D, ZHAO Z, LINDSLEY C., "Development of a custom high-throughput preparative liquid chromatography/mass spectrometer platform for the preparative purification and analytical analysis of compound libraries", J COMB CHEM., (2003), vol. 5, no. 3, pages 322 - 9 | - Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, MACK PUBLISHING COMPANY | - ANGERER, METH. ENZYMOL., (1987), vol. 152, page 649 | - "Fluorescence In Situ Hybridization: Technical Overview", JOHN M. S. BARTLETT, Molecular Diagnosis of Cancer, Methods and Protocols, (200403), pages 077 - 088 | - J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1961), page 2574 | - J AMER. CHEM. SOC., (1957), vol. 79, pages 6407 - 6413 | - J. CHEM. SOC., (1960), pages 131 - 138 | - J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1997), vol. 119, page 9913 | - BEDFORD ET AL., CHEM. COMMUN., (2001), pages 1540 - 1541 | - ANDJELKOVIC ET AL., MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1999), vol. 19, pages 5061 - 5072 | - YANG ET AL., NATURE STRUCTURAL BIOLOGY, (2002), vol. 9, pages 940 - 944 | - NOCIARI, M. M, SHALEV, A., BENIAS, P., RUSSO, C., JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGICAL METHODS, (1998), vol. 213, pages 157 - 167 | US20040621719 |