EP1805646 - SYSTEM FOR DETERMINING AND CORRECTING MAIL ENTITY DEFECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.12.2010 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.01.2011 [2011/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pitney Bowes, Inc. 1, Elmcroft Road Stamford, CT 06926 / US | [2007/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PINTSOV, Leon, A. 10 Governors Row West Hartford, CT 06117 / US | 02 /
OBREA, Andrei 57 Davis Road Seymour, CT 06483 / US | [2007/28] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/28] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05798003.9 | 21.09.2005 | [2007/28] | WO2005US33636 | Priority number, date | US20040614070P | 29.09.2004 Original published format: US 614070 P | US20050200948 | 10.08.2005 Original published format: US 200948 | US20050200640 | 10.08.2005 Original published format: US 200640 | [2007/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006039150 | Date: | 13.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1805646 | Date: | 11.07.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.04.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/00, G06F17/30 | [2010/25] | CPC: |
G07B17/00661 (EP);
G06F16/93 (EP);
G07B2017/00443 (EP);
G07B2017/00709 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2007/28] | G06F17/00 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [2008/01] |
Former [2007/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUM BESTIMMEN UND KORRIGIEREN VON MAIL-ENTITÄTS-DEFEKTEN | [2007/28] | English: | SYSTEM FOR DETERMINING AND CORRECTING MAIL ENTITY DEFECTS | [2007/28] | French: | SYSTEME POUR DETERMINER ET CORRIGER DES DEFAUTS D'ENTITE DE COURRIER | [2007/28] | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.2007 | Search fee paid | 26.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 26.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/28] | 09.12.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]GB2189064 (NIELSEN A C CO) [I] 1-29 * abstract * * page 2, line 60 - line 64 * * page 3, line 2 - line 10 * * page 3, line 50 - line 64 * * page 4, line 2 - line 11 * * page 5, line 26 - line 40 * * page 6, line 48 - line 55 * * page 8, line 64 - page 9, line 1 *; | [I]WO02070149 (US POSTAL SERVICE [US], et al) [I] 1-29 * abstract * * page 2, line 30 - page 3, line 9 * * page 5, line 24 - line 31 ** page 6, line 11 - line 15 * | International search | [X]US5079714 ; | [A]US2001054031 ; | [AE]US6959292 ; | [A]US2002144154 ; | [A]US2004031846 ; | [AP]US2005132071 |