EP1845834 - ARTICULATING MECHANISM COMPRISING PAIRS OF LINK COMPONENTS CONNECTED BY CABLES AND WHICH CAN BE EASILY ASSEMBLED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.09.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.10.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.06.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intuitive Surgical Operations, Inc. 1020 Kifer Road Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | [2016/22] |
Former [2016/15] | For all designated states Intuitive Surgical Operations, Inc. 1266 Kifer Road Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | ||
Former [2007/43] | For all designated states Novare Surgical Systems, Inc. 10440A Bubb Road Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DANITZ, David, J. 5030 New Trier Avenue San Jose, CA 95136 / US | [2007/43] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/47] | J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2007/43] | Price, Nigel John King J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05798225.8 | 15.09.2005 | [2007/43] | WO2005US33257 | Priority number, date | US20040630912P | 24.11.2004 Original published format: US 630912 P | US20050121668 | 03.05.2005 Original published format: US 121668 | [2007/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006057699 | Date: | 01.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1845834 | Date: | 24.10.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1845834 | Date: | 21.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/005 | [2007/43] | CPC: |
A61B1/0055 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/47] |
Former [2007/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | GELENKMECHANISMUS MIT PAAREN VON VERBUNDENEN KOMPONENTEN, DIE ÜBER KABEL VERBUNDEN SIND UND LEICHT DEMONTIERT WERDEN KÖNNEN | [2007/43] | English: | ARTICULATING MECHANISM COMPRISING PAIRS OF LINK COMPONENTS CONNECTED BY CABLES AND WHICH CAN BE EASILY ASSEMBLED | [2007/43] | French: | MECANISME D'ARTICULATION COMPORTANT DES PAIRES DE COMPOSANTS DE LIAISON RELIES PAR DES CABLES ET QUI PEUVENT ETRE FACILEMENT ASSEMBLES | [2007/43] | Entry into regional phase | 08.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 08.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/43] | 03.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.10.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.03.2017 | Opposition(s) | 22.08.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 22.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 26.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 25.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.09.2005 | AT | 21.11.2018 | CY | 21.11.2018 | CZ | 21.11.2018 | DK | 21.11.2018 | EE | 21.11.2018 | ES | 21.11.2018 | FI | 21.11.2018 | IT | 21.11.2018 | LT | 21.11.2018 | LV | 21.11.2018 | MC | 21.11.2018 | NL | 21.11.2018 | PL | 21.11.2018 | RO | 21.11.2018 | SE | 21.11.2018 | SI | 21.11.2018 | SK | 21.11.2018 | TR | 21.11.2018 | BG | 21.02.2019 | GR | 22.02.2019 | IS | 21.03.2019 | PT | 21.03.2019 | [2021/32] |
Former [2021/26] | AT | 21.11.2018 | |
CY | 21.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
TR | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 21.11.2018 | |
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
TR | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 21.11.2018 | |
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
TR | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AT | 21.11.2018 | |
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 21.11.2018 | |
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 21.11.2018 | |
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AT | 21.11.2018 | |
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AT | 21.11.2018 | |
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 21.11.2018 | |
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 21.11.2018 | |
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 21.11.2018 | |
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 21.11.2018 | |
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 21.11.2018 | |
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 21.11.2018 | Cited in | International search | [AD]US5916146 (ALLOTTA BENEDETTO [IT], et al) [AD] 1,3,14,15 * column 5, line 44 - line 54; figure 5 *; | [XA]EP1395398 (OLIVER CRISPIN ROBOTICS LTD [GB]) [X] 1,2,11,13,27,29 * figures 1-4 * * column 8, line 8 - line 17 * [A] 14,23,25; | [AP]WO2004105578 (NOVARE SURGICAL SYSTEMS INC [US], et al) [AP] 1-30* the whole document * |