EP1806752 - MOLECULE CHEMISTRY NUCLEAR FUSION REACTION GENERATION METHOD AND MOLECULE CHEMISTRY NUCLEAR FUSION ENERGY GENERATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.10.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ikegami, Sayaka 12-50, Hibarigaoka 2-chome Takarazuka-shi, Hyogo 665-0805 / JP | For all designated states Yougen Kaisha Rine 12-50, Hibarigaoka 2-chome Takarazuka-shi, Hyogo 665-0805 / JP | For all designated states Sakaguchi Dennetsu Kabushiki Kaisha 12-50, Hibarigaoka 2-chome Takarazuka-shi, Hyogo 665-0805 / JP | For all designated states IKEGAMI, Hidetsugu 12-50, Hibarigaoka 2-chome Takarazuka-shi, Hyogo 665-0805 / JP | [2007/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2007/28] | Representative(s) | Kronthaler, Wolfgang N.K., et al Kronthaler, Schmidt & Coll. Patentanwälte Pfarrstrasse 14 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/12] | Kronthaler, Wolfgang N.K., et al Kronthaler, Schmidt & Coll. Intellectual Property Counselors Pfarrstrasse 14 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/28] | Kronthaler, Wolfgang N.K. Kronthaler, Schmidt & Coll., Steinsdorfstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05799206.7 | 24.10.2005 | [2007/28] | WO2005JP19851 | Priority number, date | JP20040309176 | 25.10.2004 Original published format: JP 2004309176 | [2007/28] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006046680 | Date: | 04.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1806752 | Date: | 11.07.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.05.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G21B1/00 | [2007/28] | CPC: |
G21B3/00 (EP,US);
Y02E30/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [2008/05] |
Former [2007/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MOLEKÜL-CHEMIE-KERNFUSIONS-REAKTIONS-ERZEUGUNGSVERFAHREN UND MOLEKÜL-CHEMIE-KERNFUSIONS-ENERGIEGENERATOR | [2007/28] | English: | MOLECULE CHEMISTRY NUCLEAR FUSION REACTION GENERATION METHOD AND MOLECULE CHEMISTRY NUCLEAR FUSION ENERGY GENERATOR | [2007/28] | French: | PROCÉDÉ CONSISTANT À GÉNÉRER UNE RÉACTION DE FUSION NUCLÉAIRE PAR CHIMIE MOLÉCULAIRE ET GÉNÉRATEUR D'ÉNERGIE PAR FUSION NUCLÉAIRE PAR CHIMIE MOLÉCULAIRE | [2007/28] | Entry into regional phase | 24.04.2007 | Translation filed | 16.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 16.04.2007 | Search fee paid | 16.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/28] | 14.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 24.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/48] | 29.06.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2009 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9512883 (ENECO INC [US]) [Y] 3 * abstract * * page 22, lines 19-21 *; | [Y]WO02097823 (UT BATTELLE LLC [US], et al) [Y] 2,6,7 * page 39, lines 12-21; figure 8b * * page 45, lines 3-19 *; | [Y]JP2003130998 (IKEGAMI HIDETSUGU, et al) [Y] 4,8 * abstract *; | [XY]EP1345238 (IKEGAMI HIDETSUGU [JP], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] , [0007] , [0013] , [0017] * [Y] 2-9; | [Y]JP2004020357 (IKEGAMI HIDETSUGU, et al) [Y] 5,9* abstract * | International search | [Y]JP2003130997 (IKEGAMI HIDETSUGU, et al); | [Y]JPH06324167 (TAMURA NAOKI); | [Y]JPS58207000 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND); | [Y]JP2004020357 (IKEGAMI HIDETSUGU, et al); | [Y]JP2003130998 (IKEGAMI HIDETSUGU, et al); | [Y]JP2003130978 (IKEGAMI HIDETSUGU, et al) | [A] - EULE R.P. ET AL., "Radiative Capture in the Light Heavy-Ion Systems 6Li+6Li and 6Li+7Li at Ec.m.=1-8 MeV", NUCLEAR PHYSICS A, (1991), vol. 529, pages 387 - 409, XP002996379 |