EP1810396 - A DRIVE MECHANISM FOR ELEVATING AND LOWERING A TABLETOP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.11.2010 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.12.2010 [2010/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Labofa Munch A/S Smidstrupvej 11 4230 Skaelskor / DK | [2007/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NIELSEN, Henrik, Jul Nielsen Innovation 43, rue Royale F-77300 Fontainebleau / FR | [2008/35] |
Former [2007/30] | 01 /
NIELSEN, Henrik, Jul 102 Rue Saint Merry F-77300 Fontainebleau / FR | Representative(s) | Sundien, Thomas, et al Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2007/30] | Sundien, Thomas, et al Zacco Denmark A/S, Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | Application number, filing date | 05799324.8 | 07.11.2005 | [2007/30] | WO2005DK00709 | Priority number, date | WO2004DK01706 | 05.11.2004 Original published format: PCT/DK2004/001706 | WO2004DK01712 | 08.11.2004 Original published format: PCT/DK2004/001712 | [2007/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006048023 | Date: | 11.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1810396 | Date: | 25.07.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H02P7/00, H02P3/06, H02P3/22 | [2007/30] | CPC: |
H02P3/22 (EP);
H02P3/06 (EP);
H02P7/03 (EP);
H02P7/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTRIEBSMECHANISMUS ZUM HERAUF- UND HERABFAHREN EINER TISCHOBERFLÄCHE | [2007/30] | English: | A DRIVE MECHANISM FOR ELEVATING AND LOWERING A TABLETOP | [2007/30] | French: | MECANISME D'ELEVATION ET D'ABAISSEMENT D'UN PLATEAU DE TABLE | [2007/30] | Entry into regional phase | 08.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 08.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.09.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/30] | 03.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/51] | 10.06.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2007 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   12.12.2007 | 30.11.2008 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   15.07.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1079511 (LINAK A/S) [X] 1-11,1-11,1-11 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0049]; figures 1-7 * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0049]; figures 1-7 * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0049]; figures 1-7 *; | [A]US5760555 (YAMANO ET AL) [A] 1-11,1-11,1-11 * column 2, line 8 - column 3, line 23; figures 1-3 * * column 2, line 8 - column 3, line 23; figures 1-3 * * column 2, line 8 - column 3, line 23; figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE3305770 (ROBERT BOSCH GMBH) [A] 1-11,1-11,1-11 * page 6, line 22 - page 11, line 29 * * page 6, line 22 - page 11, line 29 * * page 6, line 22 - page 11, line 29 *; | [A]EP0651489 (SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS, LTD) [A] 1-11,1-11,1-11 * column 1, line 13 - column 7, line 24; figures 1-7 * * column 1, line 13 - column 7, line 24; figures 1-7 * * column 1, line 13 - column 7, line 24; figures 1-7 *; | [X]JPS59172993 ; | [A]EP0945976 (LINAK A/S) [A] 1-11,1-11,1-11 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0036]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0036]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0036]; figure 1 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850206), vol. 009, no. 027, Database accession no. (E - 294), & JP59172993 A 19840929 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO KK) [X] 1-11,1-11,1-11 * abstract * * abstract * * abstract * |