EP1835221 - VACUUM HEAT INSULATION TUBE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.09.2009 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 5-33 Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP | [2007/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIROSE, Masayuki c/o Sumitomo El. Industries, Ltd. 1-3, Shimaya 1-chome, Konchana-ku Osaka / JP | [2007/38] | Representative(s) | Joly, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/38] | Joly, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 05799337.0 | 28.10.2005 | [2007/38] | WO2005JP19859 | Priority number, date | JP20040349045 | 01.12.2004 Original published format: JP 2004349045 | [2007/38] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006059442 | Date: | 08.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1835221 | Date: | 19.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F16L59/06, F16L59/14, H01B12/14, H01B13/00 | [2007/38] | CPC: |
F16L59/065 (EP,US);
F16L59/06 (KR);
F16L59/14 (KR);
F16L59/141 (EP,US);
H01B12/14 (KR);
H01B13/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FR, IT [2008/11] |
Former [2007/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VAKUUMWÄRMEISOLIERUNGSROHR | [2007/38] | English: | VACUUM HEAT INSULATION TUBE | [2007/38] | French: | TUBE CALORIFUGE A VIDE | [2007/38] | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.2006 | Translation filed | 26.09.2006 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.2006 | Search fee paid | 26.09.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.09.2006 | Examination requested [2007/38] | 05.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/44] | 09.06.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2008 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH04148181 (SHARP KK) | by applicant | JPS58143041 | JP2004138283 |