EP1841825 - HYDROPHOBIC SILICA AND ITS USE IN SILICONE RUBBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.01.2012 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Rellinghauser Strasse 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2007/45] | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Bennigsenplatz 1 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2007/41] | For all designated states Degussa GmbH Bennigsenplatz 1 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEYER, Jürgen Grossostheimer Strasse 51 63811 Stockstadt / DE | 02 /
SCHOLZ, Mario Weinbergstrasse 35 63584 Gründau / DE | [2007/41] | Representative(s) | Hirsch, Hans-Ludwig, et al Evonik Degussa GmbH IP Management - Patente und Marken Rodenbacher Chaussee 4 63457 Hanau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/16] | Hirsch, Hans-Ludwig, et al Evonik Degussa GmbH Intellectual Property Management PATENTE & MARKEN Rodenbacher Chaussee 4 63457 Hanau / DE | ||
Former [2007/41] | Weber, Wolfgang Degussa GmbH S-IPM-PAT Postcode 84/339 Rodenbacher Chaussee 4 63457 Hanau / DE | Application number, filing date | 05799459.2 | 29.10.2005 | [2007/41] | WO2005EP11606 | Priority number, date | DE20041055585 | 18.11.2004 Original published format: DE102004055585 | DE20041055586 | 18.11.2004 Original published format: DE102004055586 | [2007/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006053632 | Date: | 26.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/21] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1841825 | Date: | 10.10.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1841825 | Date: | 23.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C09C1/30, C08K3/36, C08K9/02 | [2007/41] | CPC: |
C09C1/3045 (EP,US);
C09C1/30 (KR);
C01B33/183 (EP);
C08K3/36 (EP,US);
C08K9/02 (EP,US);
C08L83/04 (EP);
C09C1/3081 (EP,US);
C09C1/309 (EP,US);
C01P2006/10 (EP,US);
C01P2006/11 (EP,US);
C01P2006/12 (EP,US);
C01P2006/19 (EP,US);
C01P2006/80 (EP,US);
C08G77/045 (EP);
C08G77/12 (EP);
C08G77/26 (EP);
C08G77/70 (EP);
Y10T428/2991 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2995 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L83/04, C08L2666/54 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HYDROPHOBE KIESELSÄURE UND VERWENDUNGIN SILICONKAUTSCHUK | [2007/41] | English: | HYDROPHOBIC SILICA AND ITS USE IN SILICONE RUBBER | [2007/41] | French: | SILICE HYDROPHOBE ET SON UTILISATION DANS DU CAOUTCHOUC DE SILICONE | [2007/41] | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/41] | 01.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.10.2010 | 12.10.2010 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 10.11.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.03.2011 | CY | 23.03.2011 | CZ | 23.03.2011 | DK | 23.03.2011 | EE | 23.03.2011 | FI | 23.03.2011 | HU | 23.03.2011 | LT | 23.03.2011 | LV | 23.03.2011 | PL | 23.03.2011 | RO | 23.03.2011 | SE | 23.03.2011 | SI | 23.03.2011 | SK | 23.03.2011 | BG | 23.06.2011 | GR | 24.06.2011 | ES | 04.07.2011 | IS | 23.07.2011 | PT | 25.07.2011 | IE | 29.10.2011 | LU | 29.10.2011 | MC | 31.10.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/25] | AT | 23.03.2011 | |
CY | 23.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
DK | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
PL | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
ES | 04.07.2011 | ||
IS | 23.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
IE | 29.10.2011 | ||
LU | 29.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 23.03.2011 | |
CY | 23.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
DK | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
PL | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
ES | 04.07.2011 | ||
IS | 23.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
IE | 29.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/25] | AT | 23.03.2011 | |
CY | 23.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
DK | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
PL | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
ES | 04.07.2011 | ||
IS | 23.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 23.03.2011 | |
CY | 23.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
DK | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
PL | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
ES | 04.07.2011 | ||
IS | 23.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | AT | 23.03.2011 | |
CY | 23.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
DK | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
ES | 04.07.2011 | ||
IS | 23.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | AT | 23.03.2011 | |
CY | 23.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
ES | 04.07.2011 | ||
IS | 23.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
PL | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 23.03.2011 | |
CY | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/40] | AT | 23.03.2011 | |
CY | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 23.03.2011 | |
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | LT | 23.03.2011 | |
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]US6328944 (MANGOLD HELMUT [DE], et al) [A] 1* column 1, line 30 - line 41; example 5; claims 1-4,8,9 *; | [A]US6331588 (AZECHI SYUUICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * column 4, line 35 - column 7, line 66 *; | [DX]US2002168524 (KERNER DIETER [DE], et al) [DX] 1-8 * paragraphs [0005] - [0123] - [0128] - [0131] - [0139] , [0141] , [0204]; example 3; claims 1-5; table 2 *; | [Y]US2003089279 (MEYER JURGEN [DE], et al) [Y] 1-8 * paragraphs [0009] - [0013] - [0016] - [0137] - [0144] - [0147] - [0151] , [0152] , [0161]; claims 1,3-5,8-10 *; | [Y]WO2004005393 (DEGUSSA [DE], et al) [Y] 1-3,5-8 * page 2, line 18 - line 23 * * page 3, line 23 - page 4, line 18; claim 1 *; | [Y]WO2004033544 (DEGUSSA [DE], et al) [Y] 1-8 * page 1, line 20 - line 30 * * page 2, line 9 - line 10 * * page 6, line 1 - line 16 * * examples 1-4; claims 1-3 * | by applicant | DE19650500 | DE19943666 | US6331588 | EP1236773 | - Ullmanns Enzyklopadie der technischen Chemie, 4th EDITION, vol. 21, page 464 |