EP1844435 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR PROVIDING SECURE CODECS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.07.2009 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] | 31.07.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Widevine Technologies, Inc. 901 Fifth Avenue Suite 3400 Seattle, WA 98164 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/42] | For all designated states Widevine Technologies, Inc. 901 Fifth Avenue, Suite 3400 Seattle, WA 98164 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORTEN, Glenn, A. 6035 173rd Avenue SE Bellevue, WA 98006 / US | 02 /
PALMER, Tomás, Earl 22109 NE 114th Street Redmond, WA 98053 / US | 03 /
MACLEAN, Charles, Duncan 444 Harrison Avenue Claremont, CA 91711 / US | [2007/42] | Representative(s) | Carter, Stephen John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Carter, Stephen John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | ||
Former [2007/42] | Carter, Stephen John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 05799669.6 | 20.09.2005 | [2007/42] | WO2005US33616 | Priority number, date | US20040612757P | 24.09.2004 Original published format: US 612757 P | US20050230291 | 19.09.2005 Original published format: US 230291 | [2007/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006036654 | Date: | 06.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/14] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1844435 | Date: | 17.10.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.07.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/00, G06Q30/00, H04L9/00 | [2008/10] | CPC: |
H04N7/173 (EP,US);
H04N21/4367 (EP,US);
G06F21/10 (EP,US);
G06F21/50 (US);
H04L9/3247 (EP,US);
H04L9/3263 (EP,US);
H04N21/43637 (EP,US);
H04N21/4405 (EP,US);
H04N21/4627 (EP,US);
H04N21/8355 (EP,US);
H04N7/1675 (EP,US);
H04L2209/605 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/42] | G06Q99/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG SICHERER KODEX | [2007/42] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR PROVIDING SECURE CODECS | [2007/42] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME PERMETTANT DE REALISER DES CODEURS-DECODEURS SECURISES | [2007/42] | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 10.07.2007 | Search fee paid | 10.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/42] | 27.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/36] | 17.04.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2007 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   08.01.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5949879 (BERSON WILLIAM [US], et al) [A] 1-21* the whole document *; | [X]WO0030292 (ABLE TECHNOLOGIES INC N [US]) [X] 1-21 * abstract * * page 3, line 17 - page 4, line 11 * * page 6, line 5 - page 8, line 21 *; | [A]JP2003272286 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [A] 8,12,21 * the whole document *; | [A]US2004184616 (MORTEN GLENN A [US]) [A] 1-21 * abstract * | International search | [A]US2002018566 (KAWATSURA YOSHIAKI [JP], et al); | [A]US2003217275 (BENTLEY KEITH [US], et al); | [A]US2004010602 (VLECK PAUL F VAN [US], et al) |