EP1804879 - SYSTEMS FOR BI-LATERAL GUIDEWIRE CANNULATION OF BRANCHED BODY LUMENS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/28] | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR BI-LATERAL GUIDEWIRE CANNULATION OF BRANCHED BODY LUMENS | ||
[2010/02] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.02.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.03.2011 [2011/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FlowMedica, Inc. 46563 Fremont Boulevard Fremont, CA 94538 / US | [2007/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ELKINS, Jeffrey, M. 12 Rebelo Lane Novato, CA 94947 / US | 02 /
GOODSON IV, Harry, B. 3596 Dickenson Common Fremont, CA 94538 / US | 03 /
VALENCIA, Aurelio 2249 Clark Avenue East Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | 04 /
ABOYTES, Richard 355 Azalea Drive East Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | 05 /
PATEL, Samir, R. 366 Sierra Vista Avenue, 6 Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2007/28] | Representative(s) | Clark, Jane Anne, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/03] | Clark, Jane Anne, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | ||
Former [2007/28] | Kazi, Ilya, et al Mathys & Squire 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05799721.5 | 26.09.2005 | [2007/28] | WO2005US34543 | Priority number, date | US20040612801P | 24.09.2004 Original published format: US 612801 P | [2007/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006036944 | Date: | 06.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/14] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1804879 | Date: | 11.07.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.11.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/00 | [2007/28] | CPC: |
A61M25/0172 (EP,US);
A61M25/01 (EP,US);
A61M25/0105 (EP,US);
A61M25/0662 (EP,US);
A61M25/09 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME FÜR DIE BILATERALE FÜHRUNGSDRAHT-KANÜLIERUNG VON VERZWEIGTEN KÖRPERLUMEN | [2010/02] | English: | SYSTEMS FOR BI-LATERAL GUIDEWIRE CANNULATION OF BRANCHED BODY LUMENS | [2010/02] | French: | SYSTEMES D'INSERTION BILATERALE DE FIL-GUIDE DANS DES LUMIERES DE BRANCHES DU CORPS | [2010/02] |
Former [2007/28] | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN FÜR DIE BILATERALE FÜHRUNGSDRAHT-KANÜLIERUNG VON VERZWEIGTEN KÖRPERLUMEN | ||
Former [2007/28] | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR BI-LATERAL GUIDEWIRE CANNULATION OF BRANCHED BODY LUMENS | ||
Former [2007/28] | SYSTEMES ET PROCEDES D'INSERTION BILATERALE DE FIL-GUIDE DANS DES LUMIERES DE BRANCHES DU CORPS | Entry into regional phase | 19.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 19.04.2007 | Search fee paid | 19.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.04.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/28] | 19.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/10] | 19.10.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2011/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO9716217 (DEBIOTECH SA [CH], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 2-10; | [XA]WO9944539 (SCIMED LIFE SYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 2-10; | [XA]US5720735 (DORROS GERALD [US]) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 2-10; | [XA]US6221080 (POWER JOHN A [US]) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 2-10; | [XA]WO9634580 (DIBIE ALAIN [FR]) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 2-10 | International search | [A]US5509900 (KIRKMAN THOMAS R [US]) | by applicant | WO9716217 |