EP1809592 - A PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF 1,4-DIALKYL-2,3-DIOL-1,4-BUTANEDIONE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.01.2009 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.11.2011 [2011/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FIRMENICH SA 1, route des Jeunes P.O. Box 239 1211 Geneva 8 / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2007/30] | For all designated states FIRMENICH SA 1, route des Jeunes P.O. Box 239 CH-1211 Geneva 8 / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAEF, Ferdinand Achermattstrasse 4 6423 Seewen / CH | 02 /
DECORZANT, René 7, chemin de Tirelonge CH-1213 Onex / CH | [2007/30] | Representative(s) | Carina, Riccardo Filippo Firmenich SA 1, route des Jeunes P.O. Box 239 1211 Genève 8 / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2007/30] | Carina, Riccardo Filippo Firmenich SA 1, route des Jeunes P.O. Box 239 CH-1211 Geneva 8 / CH | Application number, filing date | 05800293.2 | 27.10.2005 | [2007/30] | WO2005IB53511 | Priority number, date | WO2004IB03631 | 02.11.2004 Original published format: PCT/IB2004/003631 | [2007/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006048795 | Date: | 11.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1809592 | Date: | 25.07.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1809592 | Date: | 12.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C07C45/72, C07C49/17 | [2007/30] | CPC: |
C07C49/17 (EP,US);
C07C45/72 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C45/72, C07C49/17 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON 1,4-DIALKYL-2,3-DIOL-1,4-BUTANDION | [2007/30] | English: | A PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF 1,4-DIALKYL-2,3-DIOL-1,4-BUTANEDIONE | [2007/30] | French: | METHODE SERVANT A PREPARER 1,4-DIALKYL-2,3-DIOL-1,4-BUTANEDIONE | [2007/30] | Entry into regional phase | 04.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 04.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/30] | 19.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.03.2008 | BE | 12.03.2008 | CY | 12.03.2008 | CZ | 12.03.2008 | DK | 12.03.2008 | EE | 12.03.2008 | FI | 12.03.2008 | LT | 12.03.2008 | LV | 12.03.2008 | PL | 12.03.2008 | PT | 12.03.2008 | RO | 12.03.2008 | SI | 12.03.2008 | SK | 12.03.2008 | BG | 12.06.2008 | SE | 12.06.2008 | GR | 13.06.2008 | IS | 12.07.2008 | HU | 13.09.2008 | LU | 27.10.2008 | IE | 28.10.2008 | MC | 31.10.2008 | [2011/46] |
Former [2011/02] | AT | 12.03.2008 | |
BE | 12.03.2008 | ||
CY | 12.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2008 | ||
DK | 12.03.2008 | ||
EE | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
LT | 12.03.2008 | ||
LV | 12.03.2008 | ||
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
RO | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
BG | 12.06.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
GR | 13.06.2008 | ||
IS | 12.07.2008 | ||
HU | 13.09.2008 | ||
LU | 27.10.2008 | ||
IE | 28.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2010/40] | AT | 12.03.2008 | |
BE | 12.03.2008 | ||
CY | 12.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2008 | ||
DK | 12.03.2008 | ||
EE | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
LT | 12.03.2008 | ||
LV | 12.03.2008 | ||
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
RO | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
BG | 12.06.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
IS | 12.07.2008 | ||
HU | 13.09.2008 | ||
LU | 27.10.2008 | ||
IE | 28.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 12.03.2008 | |
BE | 12.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2008 | ||
DK | 12.03.2008 | ||
EE | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
LT | 12.03.2008 | ||
LV | 12.03.2008 | ||
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
RO | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
BG | 12.06.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
IS | 12.07.2008 | ||
LU | 27.10.2008 | ||
IE | 28.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2010/01] | AT | 12.03.2008 | |
BE | 12.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2008 | ||
DK | 12.03.2008 | ||
EE | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
LT | 12.03.2008 | ||
LV | 12.03.2008 | ||
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
RO | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
BG | 12.06.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
IS | 12.07.2008 | ||
IE | 28.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/28] | AT | 12.03.2008 | |
BE | 12.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2008 | ||
DK | 12.03.2008 | ||
EE | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
LT | 12.03.2008 | ||
LV | 12.03.2008 | ||
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
RO | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
BG | 12.06.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
IS | 12.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 12.03.2008 | |
BE | 12.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2008 | ||
DK | 12.03.2008 | ||
EE | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
LT | 12.03.2008 | ||
LV | 12.03.2008 | ||
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
RO | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
IS | 12.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | AT | 12.03.2008 | |
BE | 12.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2008 | ||
DK | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
LT | 12.03.2008 | ||
LV | 12.03.2008 | ||
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
RO | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
IS | 12.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/05] | AT | 12.03.2008 | |
BE | 12.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
LT | 12.03.2008 | ||
LV | 12.03.2008 | ||
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
RO | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
IS | 12.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | AT | 12.03.2008 | |
BE | 12.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
LT | 12.03.2008 | ||
LV | 12.03.2008 | ||
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
RO | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 12.03.2008 | |
BE | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
LT | 12.03.2008 | ||
LV | 12.03.2008 | ||
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | AT | 12.03.2008 | |
BE | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
LT | 12.03.2008 | ||
LV | 12.03.2008 | ||
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | AT | 12.03.2008 | |
BE | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
LT | 12.03.2008 | ||
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 12.03.2008 | |
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
LT | 12.03.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]CH474465 (FIRMENICH & CIE [CH]) [A] 1-7 * examples; claims *; | [A]US4234518 (YOSHIDA TAKAO, et al) [A] 1-7* column 3, Scheme "A" and Scheme "B"; examples, e.g. Examples I-V, XV; column 23, lines 34-56, "Table"; claims * |