EP1830079 - MOVEMENT GUIDING DEVICE FOR VACUUM ENVIRONMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.07.2014 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.08.2014 [2014/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THK CO., LTD. 11-6, Nishigotanda 3-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8503 / JP | [2007/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MICHIOKA, Hidekazu, c/o THK Co., Ltd. 11-6, Nishi Gotanda 3-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 1418503 / JP | 02 /
YOSHINO, Masahiko, c/o THK Co., Ltd. 11-6, Nishi Gotanda 3-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 1418503 / JP | [2007/36] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/23] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/21] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/36] | Schuster, Thomas Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05800468.0 | 31.10.2005 | [2007/36] | WO2005JP19982 | Priority number, date | JP20040337045 | 22.11.2004 Original published format: JP 2004337045 | JP20050315300 | 28.10.2005 Original published format: JP 2005315300 | [2007/36] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006054439 | Date: | 26.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1830079 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.05.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F16C29/06, F16C33/80, F16H25/24 | [2007/36] | CPC: |
F16C29/0647 (EP,US);
F16C33/80 (KR);
F16C29/04 (KR);
F16C29/086 (EP,US);
F16C29/088 (EP,US);
F16C33/6603 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2008/09] |
Former [2007/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEWEGUNGSFÜHRUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR VAKUUMUMGEBUNG | [2007/36] | English: | MOVEMENT GUIDING DEVICE FOR VACUUM ENVIRONMENT | [2007/36] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE GUIDAGE DE MOUVEMENT POUR ENVIRONNEMENT DE VIDE | [2007/36] | Entry into regional phase | 01.06.2007 | Translation filed | 01.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 01.06.2007 | Search fee paid | 01.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/36] | 23.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/33] | 08.04.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/33] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.01.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]JPS6293425U ; | [Y]JPH02146217U ; | [Y]JPH08168202 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [Y]JP2000027873 (NIPPON STEEL CORP); | [Y]JP2001165162 (NSK LTD); | [Y]JP2002122135 (NSK LTD) |