EP1810254 - TABLE GAME VALIDATION SYSTEM HAVING A BULK NOTE FEEDER ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 11.05.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2012 | Refusal of application | published on 13.06.2012 [2012/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JCM American Corporation 925 Pilot Road Las Vegas, NV 89119 / US | [2007/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATHIS, Gwen D. 12 Panorama Crest Avenue Las Vegas, NV 89135 / US | 02 /
HAND, Peter E. 7280 Procyon Street Las Vegas, NV 89118 / US | 03 /
KODELA, Prashanth 4217 Grove Circle Apt. 3 Las Vegas, NV 89119 / US | 04 /
HEIDEL, Raymond 4651 E Laredo Lane Cave Creek, AZ 85331 / US | 05 /
BULLOCK, James K. 5025 Sparkling Sky Avenue Las Vegas, NV 89130 / US | 06 /
IANNELLO, Richard J. 9760 Barnett Valley Road Sebastopol, CA 95472 / US | [2007/30] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/30] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05801021.6 | 13.09.2005 | [2007/30] | WO2005US32798 | Priority number, date | US20040941316 | 14.09.2004 Original published format: US 941316 | US20040958946 | 04.10.2004 Original published format: US 958946 | [2007/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006031918 | Date: | 23.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/12] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1810254 | Date: | 25.07.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.05.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A63F9/24 | [2009/25] | CPC: |
G07F17/3246 (EP);
G07F17/32 (EP);
G07F17/322 (EP);
G07F17/3232 (EP);
G07F17/3241 (EP);
G07F7/04 (EP,GB)
|
Former IPC [2007/30] | G07F7/04 | Designated contracting states | FR [2007/51] |
Former [2007/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BRETTSPIELVALIDIERUNGSSYSTEM MIT EINER MASSENNOTENZUFÜHRANORDNUNG | [2007/30] | English: | TABLE GAME VALIDATION SYSTEM HAVING A BULK NOTE FEEDER ASSEMBLY | [2007/30] | French: | SYSTEME DE VALIDATION DE JEU DE TABLE PRESENTANT UN ASSEMBLAGE DE DISPOSITIF D'ALIMENTATION DE BILLETS EN VRAC | [2007/30] | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 14.03.2007 | Search fee paid | 14.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/30] | 17.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2011 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2012/24] | 06.10.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.01.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2012/24] | 24.01.2012 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.06.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2011 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9530944 (FRANCHI JOHN FRANCO [US]) [A] 1-25* abstract *; | [A]US5613912 (SLATER TIMOTHY J [US]) [A] 1-25 * abstract * * column 3 - column 6 *; | [A]US5957776 (HOEHNE CHAD [US]) [A] 1-25 * column 4 - column 7 *; | [A]US6346044 (MCCREA JR CHARLES H [US]) [A] 1-25 * abstract *; | [X]WO03071499 (JCM AMERICAN CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-25 * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0027]; figures 2,6 * | International search | [X]US5957776 (HOEHNE); | [Y]US6264556 (IZAWA ET AL); | [Y]US4733765 (WATANABE) | Examination | US5156250 | EP0581183 |