EP1791605 - SPORTS TRAINING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.06.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.07.2009 [2009/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Miller, Larry S. 501 B Joli Rd. Carenco LA 70520 / US | For all designated states Daigle, Daniel P. 1970 Glendale Baton Rouge LA 70808 / US | For all designated states Picou, Gregory K. Post Office Box 10056 Gulfport MS 39505 / US | [2007/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2007/23] | Representative(s) | Curley, Donnacha John Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25/26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Curley, Donnacha John Hanna Moore & Curley 13 Loer Lad Lane Dublin 2 / IE | ||
Former [2007/23] | Curley, Donnacha John Hanna, Moore & Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane Dublin 2 / IE | Application number, filing date | 05801094.3 | 14.09.2005 | [2007/23] | WO2005US32704 | Priority number, date | US20040609262P | 14.09.2004 Original published format: US 609262 P | US20050071583 | 04.03.2005 Original published format: US 71583 | [2007/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006031869 | Date: | 23.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/12] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1791605 | Date: | 06.06.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.07.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A63B21/00 | [2007/23] | CPC: |
A63B69/305 (EP,US);
A63B69/244 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPORTTRAININGSSYSTEM | [2007/23] | English: | SPORTS TRAINING SYSTEM | [2007/23] | French: | SYSTEME D'ENTRAINEMENT POUR LE SPORT | [2007/23] | Entry into regional phase | 12.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 12.03.2007 | Search fee paid | 12.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.03.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/23] | 28.05.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE463046 (ALBERT RASCH) [X] 1,9,10,12* the whole document *; | [Y]US3547438 (SCHMITTER WILLIAM DAVID) [Y] 2,7,8 * the whole document *; | [XY]US3637210 (BRANTLEY ELLARD H) [X] 1,3,9,10,12 * the whole document * [Y] 2,7,8; | [X]SU1694170 (SUROVTSEV ALEKSANDR V [SU], et al) [X] 1,3-6,9,10,12 * the whole document *; | [X]US6758794 (LEE LOUIS WILLIAM [US]) [X] 1,9,10,12 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US6220992 (SHAFIK AASEF M [US]); | [A]US6530867 (SCHWENDEMANN RONALD M [US]); | [A]US6758794 (LEE LOUIS WILLIAM [US]) |