EP1943095 - COMPOSITE MADE OF LEATHER AND A FURTHER MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.10.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Azar-Pey, Esfandiar Rahim Im Winkfeld 11A 65388 Schlangenbad / DE | [2008/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2008/29] | Representative(s) | Tostmann, Holger Carl Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Tostmann, Holger Carl Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Foerstl Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7 80331 Munich / DE | ||
Former [2008/29] | Tostmann, Holger Carl Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Foerstl Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05802267.4 | 11.11.2005 | [2008/29] | WO2005EP12117 | Priority number, date | DE20051040078 | 24.08.2005 Original published format: DE102005040078 | [2008/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007022795 | Date: | 01.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1943095 | Date: | 16.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B32B9/02 | [2008/29] | CPC: |
B32B15/20 (EP,US);
B32B7/08 (EP,US);
B32B7/09 (EP,US);
B32B9/02 (EP,US);
B32B9/025 (EP,US);
B32B9/041 (EP,US);
B32B9/045 (EP,US);
B32B9/047 (EP,US);
B32B2255/00 (EP,US);
B32B2255/26 (EP,US);
B32B2307/402 (EP,US);
B32B2307/54 (EP,US);
B32B2307/712 (EP,US);
B32B2451/00 (EP,US);
B32B2601/00 (EP,US);
B32B2605/003 (EP,US);
B32B2605/08 (EP,US);
B32B2605/10 (EP,US);
B32B2605/12 (EP,US);
B32B2605/18 (EP,US);
Y10T156/10 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31678 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUS LEDER UND EINEM WEITEREN MATERIAL HERGESTELLTER VERBUNDSTOFF | [2008/29] | English: | COMPOSITE MADE OF LEATHER AND A FURTHER MATERIAL | [2008/29] | French: | COMPOSITE CONSTITUE DE CUIR ET D'UN MATERIAU SUPPLEMENTAIRE | [2008/29] | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 17.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/29] | 08.05.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/48] | 07.07.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2008 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   31.03.2009 | 30.11.2009 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB191423746 (MOERNER MARY HELEN MOERNER USU [GB]) [X] 1 * page 2, line 43 - line 44; figure .; claims 1,2 *; | [X]US2549985 (NORMINGTON JAMES B) [X] 1-9,11 * column 1, paragraph L - column 2, line 7; figure - * * column 3, line 43 - line 71 *; | [X]GB2238753 (KASEKI LTD [GB]) [X] 1-11 * page 4, line 5 - line 6; claims 1,4,7,8,10,11 * * page 2, line 11 - line 17 * * page 4, paragraph L - page 6, line 18 * * page 1, line 4 - line 10 *; | [A]WO0071341 (MAGNA EYBL GMBH [AT], et al) [A] 1-11* page 1, paragraph 1; figure .; claims 1,4 *; | [X]DE10138130 (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 1-11 * column 11, paragraph 68; claims 1,2,4,17,18 * |