EP1908034 - PORTABLE HANDHELD SECURITY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.08.2009 [2009/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Catcher, Inc. 39526 Charleston Pike Hamilton VA 20158-3322 / US | For all designated states Tabankin, Ira 1805 Colorado Avenue San Marcos, CA 90404 / US | For all designated states Sutton, John 324 Marseille Dr. Hurst, TX 76054 / US | [2008/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2008/15] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/15] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Patentanwälte Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 05802879.6 | 08.07.2005 | [2008/15] | WO2005US24506 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007008204 | Date: | 18.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1908034 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G08B19/00 | [2008/15] | CPC: |
G01S13/88 (EP);
G01S13/0209 (EP);
G01S13/885 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/15] | Extension states | AL | 08.02.2008 | BA | 08.02.2008 | HR | 08.02.2008 | MK | 08.02.2008 | YU | 08.02.2008 | Title | German: | TRAGBARES IN DER HAND GEHALTENES SICHERHEITSGERÄT | [2008/15] | English: | PORTABLE HANDHELD SECURITY DEVICE | [2008/15] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SECURITE PORTABLE | [2008/15] | Entry into regional phase | 08.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 08.02.2008 | Search fee paid | 08.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/15] | 03.02.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/33] | 11.03.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2008 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US6720905 (LEVITAN ARTHUR C [US], et al); | [Y]US2004119591 (PEETERS JOHN [US]) |