EP1796640 - VASCULAR TUNNELER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.11.2010 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.12.2010 [2010/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Maquet Cardiovascular, LLC 170 Baytech Drive San Jose, CA 95134 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states Maquet Cardiovascular LLC 170 Baytech Drive San Jose, CA 95134 / US | ||
Former [2007/25] | For all designated states Boston Scientific Limited P.O. Box 1317 Seaston House Hastings Christ Church Barbados, West Indies / BB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAIN, Matthew 129 Algonquin Trail Wayne, NJ 07470 / US | 02 /
HENDERSON, Jamie 55 Truman Boulevard Oakland, NJ 07436 / US | [2007/25] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/42] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte P.O. Box 86 02 45 81629 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/25] | Sommer, Andrea Schwabe Sandmair Marx Stuntzstr. 16 81677 Munich / DE | Application number, filing date | 05802953.9 | 03.08.2005 | [2007/25] | WO2005US27880 | Priority number, date | US20040913266 | 05.08.2004 Original published format: US 913266 | [2007/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006015384 | Date: | 09.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1796640 | Date: | 20.06.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/127, A61K38/00, A61K38/42 | [2007/25] | CPC: |
A61B17/3476 (EP,US);
A61B2017/320044 (EP,US);
A61B2017/320069 (EP,US);
A61B2017/320073 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/25] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GEFÄSSTUNNELIERER | [2007/25] | English: | VASCULAR TUNNELER | [2007/25] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TUNNELISATION VASCULAIRE | [2007/25] | Entry into regional phase | 01.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 01.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/25] | 21.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/51] | 06.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2010 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5843017 (YOON INBAE [US]) [X] 1-17 * column 10, line 41 - line 45 * * column 17, line 15 - line 27 *; | [X]US6010449 (SELMON MATTHEW R [US], et al) [X] 1-17 * column 13, line 59 - column 14, line 9 *; | [X]US5658307 (EXCONDE PRIMO D [US]) [X] 1,3-8,10,12-14,16,17 * column 9, line 1 - line 9 * * column 10, line 28 - line 40 *; | [X]US5653726 (KIETURAKIS MACIEJ J [US]) [X] 1,2,6-11,13-15,17 * column 3, line 21 - line 27 * * column 8, line 60 - column 9, line 16; figures 11A-11C *; | [X]US5472447 (ABRAMS ANDREW L [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6-11,13-15,17 * the whole document *; | [PX]US2004204728 (HAEFNER PAUL [US]) [PX] 1,2,6-11,13-15,17 * abstract * |