EP1809797 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THREAD DISTRIBUTION IN A WARPING FRAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Karl Mayer Textilmaschinen AG Fabrikstrasse 9240 Uzwil / CH | [2009/24] |
Former [2007/30] | For all designated states Benninger AG Fabrikstrasse CH-9240 Uzwil / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STORCHENEGGER, Richard Ormistrasse 123 CH-8706 Meilen / CH | 02 /
KUNZ, Lukas Untere Heslibachstrasse 64 CH-8700 Küssnacht / CH | [2007/30] | Representative(s) | Knoblauch, Andreas Patentanwälte Dr. Knoblauch PartGmbB Reuterweg 51-53 60323 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Knoblauch, Andreas Patentanwälte Dr. Knoblauch Schlosserstrasse 23 60322 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [2009/16] | Knoblauch, Andreas Patentanwälte Dr. Knoblauch Schlosserstrasse 23 60322 Frankfurt/Main / DE | ||
Former [2007/30] | Wenger, René Hepp, Wenger & Ryffel AG, Friedtalweg 5 9500 Wil / CH | Application number, filing date | 05803007.3 | 09.11.2005 | [2007/30] | WO2005EP55867 | Priority number, date | EP20040026668 | 10.11.2004 Original published format: EP 04026668 | EP20040026841 | 11.11.2004 Original published format: EP 04026841 | [2007/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006051085 | Date: | 18.05.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1809797 | Date: | 25.07.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1809797 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | D02H9/00, D02H3/00, D02H13/18 | [2007/30] | CPC: |
D02H13/18 (EP,US);
D02H3/02 (EP,US);
D02H9/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR FADENTEILUNG AN EINER SCHÄRMASCHINE | [2007/30] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THREAD DISTRIBUTION IN A WARPING FRAME | [2007/30] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR SEPARER LES FILS DANS UN OURDISSOIR | [2007/30] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/30] | 19.07.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 08.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 29.12.2010 | CZ | 29.12.2010 | DK | 29.12.2010 | EE | 29.12.2010 | FI | 29.12.2010 | HU | 29.12.2010 | IE | 29.12.2010 | LT | 29.12.2010 | LV | 29.12.2010 | NL | 29.12.2010 | PL | 29.12.2010 | PT | 29.12.2010 | RO | 29.12.2010 | SE | 29.12.2010 | SI | 29.12.2010 | SK | 29.12.2010 | BG | 29.03.2011 | GR | 30.03.2011 | IS | 29.04.2011 | [2014/34] |
Former [2013/45] | CY | 29.12.2010 | |
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
DK | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
HU | 29.12.2010 | ||
IE | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LV | 29.12.2010 | ||
NL | 29.12.2010 | ||
PL | 29.12.2010 | ||
RO | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SK | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
IS | 29.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | CY | 29.12.2010 | |
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
DK | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
IE | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LV | 29.12.2010 | ||
NL | 29.12.2010 | ||
PL | 29.12.2010 | ||
RO | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SK | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
IS | 29.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | CY | 29.12.2010 | |
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LV | 29.12.2010 | ||
NL | 29.12.2010 | ||
PL | 29.12.2010 | ||
RO | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SK | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
IS | 29.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | CY | 29.12.2010 | |
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LV | 29.12.2010 | ||
PL | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SK | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
IS | 29.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | CY | 29.12.2010 | |
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LV | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | LT | 29.12.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4683625 (BALTZER ERICH [DE]) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [DA]DE4443627 (HACOBA TEXTILMASCHINEN [DE]) [DA] 1-19* the whole document * |