EP1776714 - METHOD FOR ETCHING MESA ISOLATION IN ANTIMONY BASED COMPOUND SEMICONDUCTOR STRUCTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.06.2009 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Northrop Grumman Corporation 1840 Century Park East Los Angeles, CA 90067-2199 / US | [2007/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAM, Peter, S. 17626 De Oro Place Cerritos, CA 90703 / US | 02 /
LANGE, Michael, D. 1159 South Silver Star Way Anaheim, CA 92808 / US | 03 /
TSAI, Roger, S. 22499 Kent Avenue Torrance, CA 90505 / US | [2007/17] | Representative(s) | Moore, Barry, et al Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25/26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/17] | Moore, Barry, et al Hanna, Moore & Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane Dublin 2 / IE | Application number, filing date | 05803227.7 | 22.07.2005 | [2007/17] | WO2005US26117 | Priority number, date | US20040918119 | 12.08.2004 Original published format: US 918119 | [2007/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006020355 | Date: | 23.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1776714 | Date: | 25.04.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/306 | [2007/17] | CPC: |
H01L29/66462 (EP,US);
H01L21/30621 (EP,US);
H01L29/7783 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/47] |
Former [2007/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ÄTZVERFAHREN FÜR MESAISOLIERUNG VON HALBLEITERSTRUKTUREN MIT ANTIMONBASIERTER VERBINDUNG | [2007/17] | English: | METHOD FOR ETCHING MESA ISOLATION IN ANTIMONY BASED COMPOUND SEMICONDUCTOR STRUCTURES | [2007/17] | French: | PROCEDE DE GRAVURE D'ISOLATION MESA DANS DES STRUCTURES DE SEMI-CONDUCTEURS A BASE D'ANTIMOINE | [2007/17] | Entry into regional phase | 15.01.2007 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/17] | 15.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/30] | 03.03.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2008 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US6133593 (BOOS J BRAD [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * example 1 *; | [A]US6384432 (BERENZ JOHN J [US]) [A] 1-5,9 * column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 5 * * column 4, lines 46-50 *; | [A]US4640737 (NAGASAKA HIROKO [JP], et al) [A] 9,11 * column 8, lines 45-54 * * column 9, lines 25-30 * | [A] - KANJI YOH ET AL, "AN INAS CHANNEL HETEROJUNCTION FIELD-EFFECT TRANSISTOR WITH HIGH TRANSCONDUCTANCE", IEEE ELECTRON DEVICE LETTERS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19901101), vol. 11, no. 11, ISSN 0741-3106, pages 526 - 528, XP000148746 [A] 1-7 * II. Fabrication;; figure 1(b) * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/55.63021 |