EP1815540 - LIGHT-EMITTING DEVICE WITH INORGANIC HOUSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.06.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.02.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Signify Holding B.V. High Tech Campus 48 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2019/11] |
Former [2018/50] | For all designated states Philips Lighting Holding B.V. High Tech Campus 48 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2016/34] | For all designated states Philips Lighting Holding B.V. High Tech Campus 45 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2013/39] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2007/32] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BECKERS, Lucas, J., A., M. c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2007/32] | Representative(s) | Verweij, Petronella Daniëlle, et al Signify Netherlands B.V. Intellectual Property High Tech Campus 7 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2019/31] |
Former [2008/25] | Bekkers, Joost J.J, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2007/32] | Rolfes, Johannes Gerardus Albertus Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 05803924.9 | 15.11.2005 | [2007/32] | WO2005IB53752 | Priority number, date | EP20040105918 | 19.11.2004 Original published format: EP 04105918 | [2007/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006054233 | Date: | 26.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/21] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1815540 | Date: | 08.08.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1815540 | Date: | 31.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01L51/52, H01L25/075 | [2019/11] | CPC: |
H01L25/075 (EP,US);
H10K50/856 (US);
H10K50/84 (US);
H01L25/0753 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US);
H10K2102/3026 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/32] | H01L33/00 | ||
Former IPC [2007/32] | H01L51/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/31] |
Former [2007/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | LEUCHTDIODE MIT GEHÄUSE AUS ANORGANISCHEM MATERIAL | [2019/10] | English: | LIGHT-EMITTING DEVICE WITH INORGANIC HOUSING | [2007/32] | French: | DISPOSITIF ELECTROLUMINESCENT COMPRENANT UN BOITIER INORGANIQUE | [2007/32] |
Former [2007/32] | LICHTEMITTIERENDE VORRICHTUNG MIT ANORGANISCHEM GEHÄUSE | Entry into regional phase | 19.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 30.10.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.10.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/50] | 15.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.06.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.11.2010 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 01.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 30.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.11.2005 | AT | 31.07.2019 | CY | 31.07.2019 | CZ | 31.07.2019 | DK | 31.07.2019 | EE | 31.07.2019 | ES | 31.07.2019 | FI | 31.07.2019 | IT | 31.07.2019 | LT | 31.07.2019 | LV | 31.07.2019 | MC | 31.07.2019 | NL | 31.07.2019 | PL | 31.07.2019 | RO | 31.07.2019 | SE | 31.07.2019 | SI | 31.07.2019 | SK | 31.07.2019 | TR | 31.07.2019 | IS | 30.10.2019 | BG | 31.10.2019 | GR | 01.11.2019 | IE | 15.11.2019 | LU | 15.11.2019 | BE | 30.11.2019 | CH | 30.11.2019 | LI | 30.11.2019 | PT | 02.12.2019 | [2021/32] |
Former [2021/26] | AT | 31.07.2019 | |
CY | 31.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SI | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
IE | 15.11.2019 | ||
LU | 15.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AT | 31.07.2019 | |
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SI | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
IE | 15.11.2019 | ||
LU | 15.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AT | 31.07.2019 | |
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SI | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
IE | 15.11.2019 | ||
LU | 15.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AT | 31.07.2019 | |
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SI | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
LU | 15.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AT | 31.07.2019 | |
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
LU | 15.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AT | 31.07.2019 | |
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
LU | 15.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AT | 31.07.2019 | |
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 31.07.2019 | |
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AT | 31.07.2019 | |
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AT | 31.07.2019 | |
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
IS | 30.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AT | 31.07.2019 | |
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
IS | 30.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 31.07.2019 | |
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
IS | 30.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 31.07.2019 | |
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
IS | 30.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 31.07.2019 | |
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AT | 31.07.2019 | |
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 31.07.2019 | |
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 31.07.2019 | Cited in | International search | [A]US6345903 (KOIKE AKIRA [JP], et al) [A] 10* figure 14 *; | [YA]US2003107046 (WAITL GUENTER [DE], et al) [Y] 6 [A] 1,11; | [A]EP1369935 (LUMILEDS LIGHTING US LLC [US]) [A] 8 * the whole document *; | [XY]US2004159920 (OMORI OSAMU [JP]) [X] 1-5,7-16 * paragraph [0061]; figures 1,6 * [Y] 6; | WO2004082036 [ ] (TOYODA GOSEI KK [JP], et al); | [T]EP1603170 (TOYODA GOSEI KK [JP], et al) [T] 1-10 * paragraph [0222]; figure 6 * | Examination | EP1267420 | JP2004200531 | by applicant | JP2003179270 |