EP1812025 - STABILIZED BACTERIOPHAGE FORMULATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chr. Hansen A/S Bøge Allé 10-12 2970 Hørsholm / DK | [2009/48] |
Former [2007/31] | For all designated states Cangagen Life Sciences Inc. 400, 1740 Woodroffe Ave. Suite 1 Ottawa, ON K2G 3R8 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MURTHY, Kishore 2118 Rexton Street Ottawa, Ontario K4A 4K8 / CA | 02 /
ENGELHARDT, Rainer 1712 Silver Bark Avenue Ottawa, Ontario K1C 7A9 / CA | [2007/31] | Representative(s) | Markvardsen, Peter, et al Chr. Hansen A/S Boge Allé 10-12 P.O. Box 407 2970 Horsholm / DK | [2010/27] |
Former [2007/31] | Wallace, Sheila Jane, et al Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 05804032.0 | 02.11.2005 | [2007/31] | WO2005CA01678 | Priority number, date | US20040624576P | 02.11.2004 Original published format: US 624576 P | [2007/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006047870 | Date: | 11.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1812025 | Date: | 01.08.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1812025 | Date: | 05.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 11.05.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A23K1/17, A23K1/18, A61K35/76 | [2012/14] | CPC: |
A61K35/76 (EP,US);
A23K20/195 (EP,US);
A23K50/10 (EP,US);
A23K50/75 (EP,US);
A23K50/80 (EP,US);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
C12N2795/00032 (EP,US);
C12N2795/00051 (EP,US);
Y02A40/818 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2007/31] | A61K35/76, A61P31/04, A23K1/16, A61P17/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/31] | Title | German: | STABILISIERTE BAKTERIOPHAGEN-FORMULIERUNGEN | [2007/31] | English: | STABILIZED BACTERIOPHAGE FORMULATIONS | [2007/31] | French: | FORMULATION A BACTERIOPHAGES STABILISEES | [2007/31] | Entry into regional phase | 04.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 04.06.2007 | Search fee paid | 04.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CA | 04.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/31] | 30.07.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 06.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP12158716.6 / EP2462940 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.03.2010 | Opposition(s) | 06.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.11.2005 | AT | 05.09.2012 | CY | 05.09.2012 | CZ | 05.09.2012 | EE | 05.09.2012 | FI | 05.09.2012 | LT | 05.09.2012 | LV | 05.09.2012 | PL | 05.09.2012 | RO | 05.09.2012 | SE | 05.09.2012 | SI | 05.09.2012 | SK | 05.09.2012 | TR | 05.09.2012 | IE | 02.11.2012 | LU | 02.11.2012 | MC | 30.11.2012 | BG | 05.12.2012 | GR | 06.12.2012 | IS | 05.01.2013 | PT | 07.01.2013 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
TR | 05.09.2012 | ||
IE | 02.11.2012 | ||
LU | 02.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
TR | 05.09.2012 | ||
IE | 02.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
IE | 02.11.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 05.09.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2004208854 (WADDELL THOMAS E [CA], et al) [X] 2-4,7-9,11-12,19-22 * paragraphs 0004, 0009 - 0031, 0049-0051, 0054-0061,examples 2-7 * [I] 5-6,10,14-16; | [XI]WO2004064732 (NEW HORIZONS DIAGNOSTICS CORP [US], et al) [X] 2-4,11-12,19-22 * p.78, line 5-p. 79, line 24 * [I] 5,7-10,14-15 | International search | [X]EP0403292 (MICROBIAL DEV LTD [GB]); | [X]US6703040 (KATSARAVA RAMAZ [GE], et al); | [X]WO03093462 (UNIV STRATHCLYDE [GB], et al); | [A]WO0151066 (INTRALYTIX INC [US], et al); | [A]WO2004045645 (BORATYNSKI JANUSZ [PL], et al) | [X] - JEPSON C D ET AL, "Bacteriophage lambda is a highly stable DNA vaccine delivery vehicle.", VACCINE., (200406), vol. 22, no. 19, pages 2413 - 2419, XP004515458 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.vaccine.2003.11.065 | [X] - SERGIENKO F E., Dry Bacterophages, Their Preparation and Use. Microbiology and Epidemiology., MEDICAL PUBLICATIONS LTD., (1945), pages 116 - 123, XP009120790 | [A] - SULAKVELIDZE A ET AL, "Bacteriophage Therapy.", ANTIMICROB AGENTS CHEMOTHER., (200103), vol. 45, no. 3, pages 649 - 659, XP008115592 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AAC.45.3.649-659.2001 | [A] - THIEL K., "Old dogma, new tricks-21st Century phage therapy.", NATURE BIOTECHNOL., (200401), vol. 22, no. 1, pages 31 - 36, XP002404412 | [A] - STONE R., "Bacteriophage therapy. Stalin's forgotten cure.", SCIENCE., (200210), vol. 298, no. 5594, pages 728 - 731, XP008118025 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.298.5594.728 | [A] - BENNETT A R ET AL, "The use of bacteriophage-based systems for the separation and concentration of Salmonella.", J APPL MICROBIOL., (199708), vol. 83, no. 2, pages 259 - 265, XP001051057 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-2672.1997.00257.x | [A] - PROUTY C C., "Storage of the Bacteriophage of the Lactic Acid Streptococci in the Desiccated State with Observations on Longevity.", APPL MICROBIOL., (1953), vol. 1, pages 250 - 251, XP008118026 | by applicant | US2004208854 | WO2004064732 |